This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/21/2020 at 01:43:34 (UTC).

Geer vs Zuniga

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Geer filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Zuniga. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Geer, Harold

Defendant

Zuniga, Sandra

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 03/20/2020 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-63 was vacated.

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Geer, Harold. Refers to: Zuniga, Sandra

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Geer, Harold. Refers to: Zuniga, Sandra

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 03/20/2020 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-63 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Geer, Harold. Refers to: Zuniga, Sandra Filed By: Geer, Harold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Geer, Harold. Refers to: Zuniga, Sandra Filed By: Geer, Harold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 03/20/2020 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less