This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/04/2019 at 05:09:18 (UTC).

GCFS, Inc. vs. Mark W. Rolph

Case Summary

On 08/27/2009 GCFS, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mark W Rolph. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-SC

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GCFS INC

Defendant

ROLPH, MARK W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUSHING-KLINE, BRIGHTON

Attorney at LEGAL DEPARTMENT OF GCFS INC

P O Box 3410

Paso Robles, CA 93447

PETERSON, BRENT D

Attorney at LEGAL DEPARTMENT OF GCFS INC

4301 Secondwind Way 110

Paso Robles, CA 93446

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Rolph, Mark

Notice to Filing Party SD

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest submitted by GCFS Inc rejected on 04/06/2018.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by GCFS Inc.

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by GCFS Inc.

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by GCFS Inc.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (cost$231.00/credit$7695.68/Interest$681.83) filed by GCFS Inc.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Writ of Execution submitted by GCFS Inc rejected on 02/15/2019. Refers to: Rolph, Mark

Case File Contents as of 05/08/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 05/08/17 - volume 1 of 1

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • *Writ of Execution Received *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution submitted by GCFS Inc rejected on 02/15/2019. Refers to: Rolph, Mark Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Rolph, Mark Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by GCFS Inc. Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest submitted by GCFS Inc rejected on 04/06/2018. Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by GCFS Inc. Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 05/08/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by GCFS Inc. Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by GCFS Inc. Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2010
  • Judgment entered for GCFS, Inc. and against Rolph, Mark W. for a grand total of 7496.85.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by GCFS, Inc.. Refers to: Rolph, Mark Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • The default filed by GCFS, Inc. was entered as to Rolph, Mark W. on Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by GCFS, Inc.. Refers to: Rolph, Mark Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2009
  • Location changed from Shelf to Clekrs judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by GCFS, Inc.. Refers to: Rolph, Mark Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • Original Summons filed by GCFS, Inc.. Refers to: Rolph, Mark Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by GCFS, Inc.. Refers to: Rolph, Mark Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.