This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/05/2019 at 06:08:11 (UTC).

GCFS Inc vs. Harris

Case Summary

On 03/13/2012 GCFS Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Harris. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GCFS INC

Defendant

HARRIS, TOM D; AKA : HARRIS, THOMAS D;AKA : HARRIS, TOM D III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NELSON, BURKE H

Attorney at LEGAL DEPARTMENT OF GCFS INC

4301 Secondwind Way 110

Paso Robles, CA 93446

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by GCFS Inc.

Statement of Venue

Statement of Venue filed by GCFS Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court submitted by GCFS Inc rejected on 07/16/2012. Refers to: Harris, Tom

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom

Notice to Filing Party SD

Abstract of Judgment submitted by GCFS Inc rejected on 11/16/2012. Refers to: Harris, Tom

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by GCFS Inc.

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by GCFS Inc. Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • *****Writ Received*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • Writ/Abstract paperwork sent to C44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment submitted by GCFS Inc rejected on 11/16/2012. Refers to: Harris, Tom Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for GCFS Inc and against Harris, Tom D for $ 5390.58, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 900.00, interest: $ 3512.59, prejudgment costs: $ 290.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 10093.17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • **Default and/or Court Judgment Papers Received**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Venue filed by GCFS Inc. Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by GCFS Inc. Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by GCFS Inc. Refers to: Harris, Tom Filed By: GCFS Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less