This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 04:03:20 (UTC).

Gay vs Sayulitas Mexican Food Mira Mesa

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Gay filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sayulitas Mexican Food Mira Mesa. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Katherine Bacal and Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Katherine Bacal

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gay, Lawrence

Defendants

Mira Mesa Shopping Center - West LLC

Flores, Rosalinda

Sayulitas Mexican Food Mira Mesa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SONNTAG, ALBERT R

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ALBERT R SONNTAG

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Gay, Lawrence.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Gay, Lawrence. Refers to: Sayulitas Mexican Food Mira Mesa; Flores, Rosalinda; Mira Mesa Shopping Center - West LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gay, Lawrence. Refers to: Sayulitas Mexican Food Mira Mesa; Flores, Rosalinda; Mira Mesa Shopping Center - West LLC

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Gay, Lawrence. Refers to: Sayulitas Mexican Food Mira Mesa; Flores, Rosalinda; Mira Mesa Shopping Center - West LLC

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/21/2021 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Bacal,Katherine to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/08/2021 09:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 10/08/2021 09:30:00 AM.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketOSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed reassigned to Braner, Matthew for 03/25/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in C-60 at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Bacal,Katherine to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketOSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 03/25/2022 at 09:00AM before Judge Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 10/08/2021 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/08/2021 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 10/08/2021 at 09:30AM before Judge Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketOSC - Sanctions scheduled for 10/08/2021 at 09:30AM before Judge Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/21/2021 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Gay, Lawrence. Refers to: Sayulitas Mexican Food Mira Mesa; Flores, Rosalinda; Mira Mesa Shopping Center - West LLC Filed By: Gay, Lawrence (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gay, Lawrence. Refers to: Sayulitas Mexican Food Mira Mesa; Flores, Rosalinda; Mira Mesa Shopping Center - West LLC Filed By: Gay, Lawrence (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Gay, Lawrence. Refers to: Sayulitas Mexican Food Mira Mesa; Flores, Rosalinda; Mira Mesa Shopping Center - West LLC Filed By: Gay, Lawrence (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Gay, Lawrence. Filed By: Gay, Lawrence (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Gay, Lawrence. Filed By: Gay, Lawrence (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/21/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mira Mesa Shopping Center - West LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SONNTAG, ALBERT R