This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/10/2019 at 11:48:37 (UTC).

Gatpandan vs Imperial Enterprises

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 Gatpandan filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Imperial Enterprises. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GATPANDAN, ZENAIDA F

Defendants

CONCOURSE GROUP

OCEANSIDE ASSOCIATES

IMPERIAL ENTERPRISES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARSON, CHARLES L

Attorney at LAWSON LAW GROUP

1283 N Tustin Ave

Anaheim, CA 92807

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Imperial Enterprises; Oceanside Associates; Concourse Group

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Imperial Enterprises

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Oceanside Associates

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Concourse Group

Order for Publication of Summons/Citation

Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Imperial Enterprises; Concourse Group; Oceanside Associates

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Imperial Enterprises

Proof of Service by Publication

Proof of Service by Publication filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Oceanside Associates; Imperial Enterprises; Concourse Group

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Oceanside Associates; Imperial Enterprises; Concourse Group

Application for Court Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Imperial Enterprises; Oceanside Associates; Concourse Group

Statement of the Case

Statement of Case filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F.

of Charles L Larson in Support of Default Judgment by Court

Declaration - Other (of Charles L Larson in Support of Default Judgment by Court) filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 23]

of Charles L Larson in Support of Default Judgment by Court

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Gatpandan, Zenaida F rejected on 11/02/2017. Refers to: Imperial Enterprises; Oceanside Associates; Concourse Group

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

[Another document for ROA# 32]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 32]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Gatpandan, Zenaida F rejected on 11/02/2017. Refers to: Imperial Enterprises; Oceanside Associates; Concourse Group Filed By: Gatpandan, Zenaida F (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Filed By: Gatpandan, Zenaida F (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/12/2018 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Gatpandan, Zenaida F and against Concourse Group;Imperial Enterprises;Oceanside Associates for $ 0.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court (Default Judgment By Court) filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Imperial Enterprises; Oceanside Associates; Concourse Group Filed By: Gatpandan, Zenaida F (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Default Prove-Up Hearing heard 10/30/2017 11:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Default Prove-Up Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2017 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Imperial Enterprises; Concourse Group; Oceanside Associates Filed By: Gatpandan, Zenaida F (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Concourse Group Filed By: Gatpandan, Zenaida F (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Oceanside Associates Filed By: Gatpandan, Zenaida F (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/12/2018 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Imperial Enterprises Filed By: Gatpandan, Zenaida F (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Imperial Enterprises Filed By: Gatpandan, Zenaida F (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Gatpandan, Zenaida F. Refers to: Imperial Enterprises; Oceanside Associates; Concourse Group Filed By: Gatpandan, Zenaida F (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Imperial enterprise services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LARSON CHARLES L.