Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/11/2021 at 07:56:37 (UTC).

Gates vs Terrace View Partners LP

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 Gates filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Terrace View Partners LP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gates, James

Defendants

Terrace View Partners LP; DBA : Terrace View Mobile Estates

WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Rubin, Julie H

Attorney at GREBOW & RUBIN LLP

 

Court Documents

Motion to Reclassify

Motion to Reclassify filed by Gates, James.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Correction of Telephone Number) filed by Gates, James.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of James Gates in support of Motion to Reclassify case as Unlimited) filed by Gates, James.

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Gates, James.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Gates, James. Refers to: Terrace View Partners LP

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/05/2021 10:30:00 AM.

Notice - Other (Notices)

Notice - Other (OF REQUEST TO APPEAR SPECIALLY TO SUBMIT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION) filed by WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE.

Substitution of Attorney (Participant Information)

Substitution of Attorney filed by WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE.

Motion to Strike (Motions)

Motion to Strike filed by WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE.

Request for Judicial Notice (Requests)

Request for Judicial Notice (in support of motion to strike) filed by WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (of Larry W Weaver in support of motion to strike) filed by WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (of Julie H Rubin in support of demurrer) filed by WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Gates, James. Refers to: Terrace View Partners LP; WEAVER, LARRY

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gates, James. Refers to: Terrace View Partners LP; WEAVER, LARRY

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Gates, James. Refers to: Terrace View Partners LP; WEAVER, LARRY

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: SLAPP / SLAPPback Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike filed by WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE. Filed By: WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (in support of motion to strike) filed by WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE. Filed By: WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Larry W Weaver in support of motion to strike) filed by WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE. Filed By: WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer filed by WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE. Filed By: WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Julie H Rubin in support of demurrer) filed by WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE. Filed By: WEAVER, LARRY WAYNE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 02/05/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/06/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Gates, James. Filed By: Gates, James (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Gates, James. Refers to: Terrace View Partners LP; WEAVER, LARRY Filed By: Gates, James (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gates, James. Refers to: Terrace View Partners LP; WEAVER, LARRY Filed By: Gates, James (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Gates, James. Refers to: Terrace View Partners LP; WEAVER, LARRY Filed By: Gates, James (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Gates, James. Filed By: Gates, James (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julie H. Rubin