This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 11:20:14 (UTC).

Gary Zendell vs. Heartland Payment Systems LLC

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 Gary Zendell filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Heartland Payment Systems LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Isa Bella Restaurants LP

Zendell, Gary

Defendant

Heartland Payment Systems LLC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 05/04/2020 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-63 was vacated.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Isa Bella Restaurants LP; Zendell, Gary. Refers to: Heartland Payment Systems LLC

Venue Challenge

Venue Challenge filed by Heartland Payment Systems LLC.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Change of Venue letter) filed by Heartland Payment Systems LLC.

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Zendell, Gary; Isa Bella Restaurants LP. Refers to: Heartland Payment Systems LLC

Correspondence

Correspondence (Requesting Certified mail) filed by Zendell, Gary.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Isa Bella Restaurants LP; Zendell, Gary. Refers to: Heartland Payment Systems LLC Filed By: Isa Bella Restaurants LP (Plaintiff); Zendell, Gary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court dismissed without prejudice as to Heartland Payment Systems LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court dismissed without prejudice as to Zendell, Gary .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court dismissed without prejudice as to Isa Bella Restaurants LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 05/04/2020 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-63 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (Change of Venue letter) filed by Heartland Payment Systems LLC. Filed By: Heartland Payment Systems LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVenue Challenge filed by Heartland Payment Systems LLC. Filed By: Heartland Payment Systems LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Zendell, Gary; Isa Bella Restaurants LP. Refers to: Heartland Payment Systems LLC Filed By: Zendell, Gary (Plaintiff); Isa Bella Restaurants LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 05/04/2020 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCertified Mail Green Card Tracking Numbers filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence (Requesting Certified mail) filed by Zendell, Gary. Filed By: Zendell, Gary (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heartland Payment Systems, LLC is a litigant