Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 12:34:11 (UTC).

Gardner vs. Gerber

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Gardner filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Gerber. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gardner, Scott Wallace

Respondent

Gerber, Arik

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketRestraining order as requested against ARIK GERBER was granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/28/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) filed by Gardner, Scott Wallace. Refers to: Gerber, Arik Filed By: Gardner, Scott Wallace (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Gardner, Scott Wallace. Refers to: Gerber, Arik Filed By: Gardner, Scott Wallace (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Gardner, Scott Wallace. Refers to: Gerber, Arik Filed By: Gardner, Scott Wallace (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Gardner, Scott Wallace. Refers to: Gerber, Arik Filed By: Gardner, Scott Wallace (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPetitioner's request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 02/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department N-03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/07/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (Unsucessful Service) filed by Gardner, Scott Wallace. Filed By: Gardner, Scott Wallace (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Gardner, Scott Wallace. Refers to: Gerber, Arik Filed By: Gardner, Scott Wallace (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gardner, Scott Wallace. Refers to: Gerber, Arik Filed By: Gardner, Scott Wallace (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Partly GRANTED and partly DENIED) filed by Gardner, Scott Wallace. Refers to: Gerber, Arik Filed By: Gardner, Scott Wallace (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Gardner, Scott Wallace. Refers to: Gerber, Arik Filed By: Gardner, Scott Wallace (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 02/07/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 .

    Read MoreRead Less