This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 09:37:02 (UTC).

Garcia vs Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 Garcia filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Volkswagen Group of America Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Garcia, Richard

MARQUEZ, LIZETH

Defendant

Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Romano, Mark

Attorney at ROMANO STANCROFF PC

360 N Pacific Coast Highway 1010

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorney

Oh, Robert Saehan

555 South Flower Street 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Garcia, Richard; MARQUEZ, LIZETH. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garcia, Richard; MARQUEZ, LIZETH. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Garcia, Richard; MARQUEZ, LIZETH. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by MARQUEZ, LIZETH; Garcia, Richard.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Volkswagen Group of America Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Volkswagen Group of America Inc.; Filed By: Volkswagen Group of America Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by MARQUEZ, LIZETH; Garcia, Richard.; Filed By: MARQUEZ, LIZETH (Plaintiff); Garcia, Richard (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Garcia, Richard; MARQUEZ, LIZETH. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; Filed By: Garcia, Richard (Plaintiff); MARQUEZ, LIZETH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garcia, Richard; MARQUEZ, LIZETH. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; Filed By: Garcia, Richard (Plaintiff); MARQUEZ, LIZETH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Garcia, Richard; MARQUEZ, LIZETH. Refers to: Volkswagen Group of America Inc; Filed By: Garcia, Richard (Plaintiff); MARQUEZ, LIZETH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OH, ROBERT S.