This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 09:51:48 (UTC).

Garcia vs Nursing Corps Inc

Case Summary

On 08/02/2022 Garcia filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Nursing Corps Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garcia, Edith

Defendants

Alizadeh, Sahel

Cavazos, Jesse

Clayco Inc

Doe, Billy

Doe, Ethan

Nursing Corps Inc

Vargo, Mindy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cantor, Zachary

1112 Montana Ave Suite C

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Mesriani, Rodney

510 Arizona Ave

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Defendant Attorney

Muller, Kirstin E

Attorney at HIRSCHFELD KRAEMER LLP

233 Wilshire Boulevard 600

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Garcia, Edith. Refers to: Nursing Corps Inc; Clayco Inc; Doe, Ethan; Doe, Billy; Vargo, Mindy; Alizadeh, Sahel; Cavazos, Jesse

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garcia, Edith. Refers to: Nursing Corps Inc; Clayco Inc; Doe, Ethan; Doe, Billy; Vargo, Mindy; Alizadeh, Sahel; Cavazos, Jesse

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Garcia, Edith. Refers to: Nursing Corps Inc; Clayco Inc; Doe, Ethan; Doe, Billy; Vargo, Mindy; Alizadeh, Sahel; Cavazos, Jesse

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

ADR Packet generated.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

Proof of Service by Personal Service

Proof of Service filed by Garcia, Edith.

Proof of Service by Personal Service

Proof of Service filed by Garcia, Edith.

NOTICE TO STATE COURT RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Clayco Inc; Nursing Corps Inc.

Defendants Nursing Corps., Inc. And Clayco, Inc. Answer To Plaintiffs Complaint

Answer filed by Clayco Inc; Nursing Corps Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 11:45:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Clayco Inc; Nursing Corps Inc.; Filed By: Clayco Inc (Defendant); Nursing Corps Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Clayco Inc; Nursing Corps Inc.; Filed By: Clayco Inc (Defendant); Nursing Corps Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Garcia, Edith.; Filed By: Garcia, Edith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Garcia, Edith.; Filed By: Garcia, Edith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Packet generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 8]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 11:45:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Braner, Matthew.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Garcia, Edith. Refers to: Nursing Corps Inc; Clayco Inc; Doe, Ethan; Doe, Billy; Vargo, Mindy; Alizadeh, Sahel; Cavazos, Jesse; Filed By: Garcia, Edith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garcia, Edith. Refers to: Nursing Corps Inc; Clayco Inc; Doe, Ethan; Doe, Billy; Vargo, Mindy; Alizadeh, Sahel; Cavazos, Jesse; Filed By: Garcia, Edith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Garcia, Edith. Refers to: Nursing Corps Inc; Clayco Inc; Doe, Ethan; Doe, Billy; Vargo, Mindy; Alizadeh, Sahel; Cavazos, Jesse; Filed By: Garcia, Edith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clayco,Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CANTOR ZACHARY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MESRIANI RODNEY