This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 10:55:09 (UTC).

Garcia vs Huntington Ingalls Incorporated a california corporation

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 Garcia filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated a california corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA, JOSE A

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated a california corporation

DiMoc, Ricardo

HII San Diego Shipyard Inc

Securitas Security Services USA INC

Dimal, Ricardo

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Securitas Security Services USA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'Connor, Patrick F

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF PATRICK F O CONNOR

1651 E Main Street 201

El Cajon, CA 92021

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Kelly, Daniel J

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS LLP

Providian Financial Building, 201 Mission St #2310

San Francisco, CA 94105

Lewis, Douglas W

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

550 W C Street Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (As to Defendant Huntington Ingalls Incorporated Only) filed by GARCIA, JOSE A.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by GARCIA, JOSE A. Refers to: Securitas Security Services USA INC

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Securitas Security Services USA INC.

Cross-Complaint (First Papers)

Cross-Complaint filed by Securitas Security Services USA INC.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by GARCIA, JOSE A. Refers to: HII San Diego Shipyard Inc

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by HII San Diego Shipyard Inc.

Cross-Complaint (First Papers)

Cross-Complaint filed by HII San Diego Shipyard Inc. Refers to: Securitas Security Services USA INC

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Securitas Security Services USA INC.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Securitas Security Services USA INC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by GARCIA, JOSE A.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by HII San Diego Shipyard Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by GARCIA, JOSE A.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/18/2021 09:30:00 AM.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Securitas Security Services USA INC.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Order signed 8/12/21) filed by GARCIA, JOSE A. Refers to: Dimal, Ricardo

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by HII San Diego Shipyard Inc.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Securitas Security Services USA INC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by GARCIA, JOSE A.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Dimal, Ricardo. Filed By: Dimal, Ricardo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by GARCIA, JOSE A. Filed By: GARCIA, JOSE A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to stipulation to 03/18/2022 at 10:00AM before Judge Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/17/2021 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (RE: SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) filed by Securitas Security Services USA INC. Filed By: Securitas Security Services USA INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by GARCIA, JOSE A. Filed By: GARCIA, JOSE A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by GARCIA, JOSE A. Filed By: GARCIA, JOSE A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by HII San Diego Shipyard Inc. Filed By: HII San Diego Shipyard Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Securitas Security Services USA INC. Filed By: Securitas Security Services USA INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 3) filed by GARCIA, JOSE A. Refers to: Securitas Security Services USA INC Filed By: GARCIA, JOSE A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by GARCIA, JOSE A. Refers to: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated a california corporation Filed By: GARCIA, JOSE A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by GARCIA, JOSE A. Refers to: Dimal, Ricardo Filed By: GARCIA, JOSE A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/18/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by GARCIA, JOSE A. Refers to: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated a california corporation; Dimal, Ricardo; HII San Diego Shipyard Inc; Securitas Security Services USA INC Filed By: GARCIA, JOSE A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by GARCIA, JOSE A. Refers to: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated a california corporation Filed By: GARCIA, JOSE A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by GARCIA, JOSE A. Refers to: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated a california corporation Filed By: GARCIA, JOSE A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HII SAN DIEGO SHIPYARD INC. [DOE 3 AND 503] is a litigant

Latest cases where Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS, DOUGLAS W