Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/22/2020 at 01:50:09 (UTC).

GAR Properties Group LP vs Salaseli

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 GAR Properties Group LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Salaseli. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAR Properties Group LP; DBA : Pacific Gardens Apartments

Defendant

Salaseli, Farnoush

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McKinley, James R

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

[A document for ROA# 1]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[A document for ROA# 2]

Original Summons

[A document for ROA# 3]

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by GAR Properties Group LP. Refers to: Salaseli, Farnoush

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by GAR Properties Group LP. Refers to: Salaseli, Farnoush

Request for Entry of Default

[Another document for ROA# 10]

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

[Another document for ROA# 10]

Notice to Filing Party SD

[A document for ROA# 11]

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Received on 12/6/19 - Not Entered) filed by GAR Properties Group LP.

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by GAR Properties Group LP received but not filed on 12/06/2019. Refers to: Salaseli, Farnoush

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

[Another document for ROA# 19]

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises

[Another document for ROA# 19]

Default 19-61051

[Another document for ROA# 19]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 19]

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment (with supporting documents) filed by GAR Properties Group LP.

Motion to Set Aside Default

Motion to Set Aside Default (and Default Judgment) filed by Salaseli, Farnoush.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Salaseli, Farnoush, on 02/11/2020, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/18/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-60 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Salaseli, Farnoush. Filed By: Salaseli, Farnoush (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Granted) filed by Salaseli, Farnoush. Filed By: Salaseli, Farnoush (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside Default (and Default Judgment) filed by Salaseli, Farnoush. Filed By: Salaseli, Farnoush (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/18/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-60 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court filed by GAR Properties Group LP. Refers to: Salaseli, Farnoush Filed By: GAR Properties Group LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for GAR Properties Group LP and against Salaseli, Farnoush for a grand total of $ 3340.87 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer submitted by Salaseli, Farnoush rejected on 01/08/2020. Filed By: Salaseli, Farnoush (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment (with supporting documents) filed by GAR Properties Group LP. Filed By: GAR Properties Group LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Salaseli, Farnoush on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by GAR Properties Group LP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by GAR Properties Group LP. Refers to: Salaseli, Farnoush Filed By: GAR Properties Group LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by GAR Properties Group LP. Refers to: Salaseli, Farnoush Filed By: GAR Properties Group LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by GAR Properties Group LP. Refers to: Salaseli, Farnoush Filed By: GAR Properties Group LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less