This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/06/2018 at 17:58:55 (UTC).

Galoyan vs. Ehrhart

Case Summary

On 01/14/2014 Galoyan filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ehrhart. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT P DAHLQUIST. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT P DAHLQUIST

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chobanyan, Anahit

Galoyan, Makruhi

Khudashyan, Vasak

Simavonyan, Armen

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

Ehrhart, Jason Stephan

Oracle America Inc

Oracle Corporation

EHRHART, JASON STEPHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSENBERG, DANIEL S

316 South Melrose Drive

Vista, CA 92081

ROSE, DANIEL S

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DANIEL S ROSE P C

107 S Melrose Dr

Vista, CA 92083

HAINES, TODD FREDERICK

30495 Canwood St

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

HAINES, TODD F

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TODD F HAINES

30495 Canwood Street 100

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Defendant Attorneys

EVERETT, JOHN H

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN H EVERETT

591 Camino De La Reina #860

San Diego, CA 92108

BUEHLER, MARK

BUEHLER, MARK B

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/26/2014 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Galoyan, Makruhi.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Galoyan, Makruhi.

Answer

Answer filed by Oracle America Inc; Oracle Corporation.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Galoyan, Makruhi; Chobanyan, Anahit; Khudashyan, Vasak; Simavonyan, Armen.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Oracle America Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Galoyan, Makruhi.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/26/2014 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (TO CONSOLIDATE W/ 14-23560) filed by Ehrhart, Jason Stephan.

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Alliance United Insurance Company. Refers to: Ehrhart, Jason

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Alliance United Insurance Company. Refers to: Ehrhart, Jason

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (Jason Stephen Ehrhart) filed by Alliance United Insurance Company. Refers to: Ehrhart, Jason

Answer

Answer filed by Ehrhart, Jason Stephen.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED) filed by Galoyan, Makruhi; Chobanyan, Anahit; Khudashyan, Vasak; Simavonyan, Armen. Refers to: Ehrhart, Jason; Oracle Corporation; Oracle America Inc

Notice of Unconditional Settlement

Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Alliance United Insurance Company.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Simavonyan, Armen .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Khudashyan, Vasak .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Chobanyan, Anahit .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Galoyan, Makruhi .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Oracle America Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Oracle Corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ehrhart, Jason Stephan .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Alliance United Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Ehrhart, Jason Stephen .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Alliance United Insurance Company; Chobanyan, Anahit; Galoyan, Makruhi; Khudashyan, Vasak; Simavonyan, Armen. Filed By: Alliance United Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Chobanyan, Anahit (Plaintiff); Galoyan, Makruhi (Plaintiff); Khudashyan, Vasak (Plaintiff); Simavonyan, Armen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Oracle America Inc; Oracle Corporation. Filed By: Oracle America Inc (Defendant); Oracle Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Galoyan, Makruhi.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Galoyan, Makruhi.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/26/2014 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Galoyan, Makruhi; Chobanyan, Anahit; Khudashyan, Vasak; Simavonyan, Armen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Galoyan, Makruhi; Chobanyan, Anahit; Khudashyan, Vasak; Simavonyan, Armen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Galoyan, Makruhi; Chobanyan, Anahit; Khudashyan, Vasak; Simavonyan, Armen.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.