This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 10:13:17 (UTC).

Gallegos vs Commercial & Industrial Roofing Co Inc

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 Gallegos filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Commercial Industrial Roofing Co Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gallegos, Ramon

Defendant

Commercial & Industrial Roofing Co Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHTANI, AANAND

Attorney at MEHTANI LAW OFFICES P C

2425 Olympic Blvd #4000W

Santa Monica, CA 90404

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Gallegos, Ramon. Refers to: Commercial & Industrial Roofing Co Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gallegos, Ramon. Refers to: Commercial & Industrial Roofing Co Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Gallegos, Ramon. Refers to: Commercial & Industrial Roofing Co Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Gallegos, Ramon. Refers to: Commercial & Industrial Roofing Co Inc

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Gallegos, Ramon.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Gallegos, Ramon.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Gallegos, Ramon. Filed By: Gallegos, Ramon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Gallegos, Ramon. Filed By: Gallegos, Ramon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Gallegos, Ramon. Refers to: Commercial & Industrial Roofing Co Inc Filed By: Gallegos, Ramon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/28/2022 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Gallegos, Ramon. Refers to: Commercial & Industrial Roofing Co Inc Filed By: Gallegos, Ramon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gallegos, Ramon. Refers to: Commercial & Industrial Roofing Co Inc Filed By: Gallegos, Ramon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Gallegos, Ramon. Refers to: Commercial & Industrial Roofing Co Inc Filed By: Gallegos, Ramon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMERCIAL & INDUSTRIAL ROOFING CO INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEHTANI AANAND