Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 09:05:46 (UTC).

Gallegos vs Acosta

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 Gallegos filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Acosta. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gallegos, Rosa Maria

Respondent

Acosta, Elvira

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketRestraining order as requested denied without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 10/22/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Gallegos, Rosa Maria. Filed By: Gallegos, Rosa Maria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 10/22/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 09/28/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Gallegos, Rosa Maria. Filed By: Gallegos, Rosa Maria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Gallegos, Rosa Maria. Filed By: Gallegos, Rosa Maria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 09/28/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Response By Mail filed by Acosta, Elvira. Refers to: Gallegos, Rosa Filed By: Acosta, Elvira (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Acosta, Elvira. Filed By: Acosta, Elvira (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition (Valid) filed by Gallegos, Rosa Maria. Refers to: Acosta, Elvira Filed By: Gallegos, Rosa Maria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Gallegos, Rosa Maria. Refers to: Acosta, Elvira; Ibarra, Roberto; Ibarra, Marisol; Ibarra, Rey; Ibarra, Luna; Ibarra Morales, Cruz Filed By: Gallegos, Rosa Maria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gallegos, Rosa Maria. Refers to: Acosta, Elvira; Ibarra, Roberto; Ibarra, Marisol; Ibarra, Rey; Ibarra, Luna; Ibarra Morales, Cruz Filed By: Gallegos, Rosa Maria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/12/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Gallegos, Rosa Maria. Filed By: Gallegos, Rosa Maria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Gallegos, Rosa Maria. Filed By: Gallegos, Rosa Maria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less