This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 08:17:40 (UTC).

GALARZA vs VILLAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 GALARZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VILLAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Galarza, Ernie

Defendant

VPM Management Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosenblit, Joseph C

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Galarza, Ernie. Refers to: VILLAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Galarza, Ernie. Refers to: VILLAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Galarza, Ernie. Refers to: VILLAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Galarza, Ernie.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint filed by Galarza, Ernie. Refers to: VPM Management Inc.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Galarza, Ernie. Refers to: VPM Management Inc.

Notice of Unconditional Settlement

Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Galarza, Ernie. Refers to: VPM Management Inc.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Galarza, Ernie.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Galarza, Ernie, on 04/06/2022, has expired.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Galarza, Ernie, on 04/06/2022, has expired.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Galarza, Ernie.; Filed By: Galarza, Ernie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Galarza, Ernie .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to VPM Management Inc..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/09/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketNotice to Court of Improved Financial Situation or Settlement filed by Galarza, Ernie.; Filed By: Galarza, Ernie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Galarza, Ernie. Refers to: VPM Management Inc.; Filed By: Galarza, Ernie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Galarza, Ernie. Refers to: VPM Management Inc.; Filed By: Galarza, Ernie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint filed by Galarza, Ernie. Refers to: VPM Management Inc.; Filed By: Galarza, Ernie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/09/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Galarza, Ernie.; Filed By: Galarza, Ernie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Galarza, Ernie.; Filed By: Galarza, Ernie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Galarza, Ernie. Refers to: VILLAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT; Filed By: Galarza, Ernie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Galarza, Ernie. Refers to: VILLAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT; Filed By: Galarza, Ernie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Galarza, Ernie. Refers to: VILLAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT; Filed By: Galarza, Ernie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less