This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/29/2021 at 19:58:38 (UTC).

Gabriel Torres vs Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 Gabriel Torres filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Torres, Gabriel

Defendant

Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard, Diane E

Attorney at RICHARD LAW PC

5060 N Harbor Drive 265

San Diego, CA 92106

Defendant Attorney

Kaufman, Thomas R

 

Court Documents

[Proposed] Order Approving PAGA Settlement and Judgment Thereon

Order - Other (Approving PAGA Settlement and Judgment Thereon) filed by Torres, Gabriel; Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC.

Declaration of Diane E. Richard ISO Class Action Dismissal

Declaration - Other (of Diane E. Richard) filed by Torres, Gabriel.

Declaration of Diane E. Richard in Support of Joint Stipulation to Approve PAGA Settlement

Declaration - Other (in Support of Joint Stipulation) filed by Torres, Gabriel; Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC.

Joint Stipulation to Approve PAGA Settlement

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Approv PAGA Settlement) filed by Torres, Gabriel; Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC.

Joint Stipulation to Vacate CMC and Set Schedule for PAGA Settlement Approval Request; Notice of Conditional Settlement

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Vacate the CMC and Set Schedule for PAGA Settlement Approval Request; Notice of Conditional Settlement) filed by Torres, Gabriel; Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC.

Proposed Order

Order - Other (Vacating the CMC Due to PAGA Settlement and Setting Schedule Re PAGA Settlement Approval Request (ORDER SIGNED 9-4-19) filed by Torres, Gabriel.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Torres, Gabriel.

Request for Dismissal (First through Seventh Causes of Action)

Request for Dismissal filed by Torres, Gabriel.

Proposed Order Granting Request for Dismissal (First through Seventh Causes of Action)

Order - Other (Granting Request for Dismissal (ORDER SIGNED 9-11-19) filed by Torres, Gabriel.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Torres, Gabriel.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Torres, Gabriel; Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC.

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Torres, Gabriel.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Torres, Gabriel.

Joint Stipulation to Continue CMC Due to Mediation

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Continue CMC Due to Mediation) filed by Torres, Gabriel; Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC.

[Proposed] Order Continuing CMC Due to Mediation

Order - Other (Continuing CMC Due to Mediation (ORDER SIGNED 7-9-19) filed by Torres, Gabriel.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Torres, Gabriel.

Defendants Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified First Amended Complaint

Answer filed by Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt re First Amended Complaint and Amended Summons

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Torres, Gabriel. Refers to: Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by Torres, Gabriel. Filed By: Torres, Gabriel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Torres, Gabriel. Filed By: Torres, Gabriel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 02:00:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Torres, Gabriel .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Granting Request for Dismissal (ORDER SIGNED 9-11-19) filed by Torres, Gabriel. Filed By: Torres, Gabriel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Torres, Gabriel and against Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC for $ 0.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Approving PAGA Settlement and Judgment Thereon) filed by Torres, Gabriel; Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC. Filed By: Torres, Gabriel (Plaintiff); Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Approv PAGA Settlement) filed by Torres, Gabriel; Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC. Filed By: Torres, Gabriel (Plaintiff); Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (in Support of Joint Stipulation) filed by Torres, Gabriel; Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC. Filed By: Torres, Gabriel (Plaintiff); Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/09/2019 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons (on First Amended Complaint) filed by Torres, Gabriel. Filed By: Torres, Gabriel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed by Torres, Gabriel. Refers to: Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC Filed By: Torres, Gabriel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Torres, Gabriel. Refers to: Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC Filed By: Torres, Gabriel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/09/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Torres, Gabriel. Refers to: Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC Filed By: Torres, Gabriel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Torres, Gabriel. Refers to: Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC Filed By: Torres, Gabriel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Torres, Gabriel. Refers to: Mitchell Repair Information Company LLC Filed By: Torres, Gabriel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARD, DIANE E