Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 16:18:44 (UTC).

Frederick C Phillips APC vs Cellco Partnership

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 Frederick C Phillips APC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Cellco Partnership. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREDERICK C PHILLIPS APC

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant

CELLCO PARTNERSHIP; DBA : VERIZON WIRELESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILLIPS, FREDERICK C

Attorney at FREDERICK C PHILLIPS APC

605 C Street 300

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

GOODMAN, BRETT B

633 W Fifth Street 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Frederick C Phillips APC.

DEFENDANT CELLCO PARTNERSHIP DBA VERIZON WIRELESS REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY THE ACTION

Reply filed by Cellco Partnership.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 05/10/2019 10:30:00 AM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Cellco Partnership.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Frederick C Phillips APC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Frederick C Phillips APC.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by Cellco Partnership received but not filed on 03/07/2019.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Tracy Gossett) filed by Cellco Partnership.

Amended Notice of Defendant Cellco Partnership dba Verizon Wireless' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action

Amended Motion (To Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action) filed by Cellco Partnership.

Answer

Answer filed by Cellco Partnership.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Frederick C Phillips APC. Refers to: Cellco Partnership

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE) filed by Frederick C Phillips APC. Refers to: Cellco Partnership

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Frederick C Phillips APC. Refers to: Cellco Partnership

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Matter decided.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 05/10/2019 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Matter taken under submission.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply filed by Cellco Partnership. Filed By: Cellco Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Frederick C Phillips APC. Filed By: Frederick C Phillips APC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other filed by Frederick C Phillips APC. Filed By: Frederick C Phillips APC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Frederick C Phillips APC. Filed By: Frederick C Phillips APC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2018
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Frederick C Phillips APC. Refers to: Cellco Partnership Filed By: Frederick C Phillips APC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/08/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Frederick C Phillips APC. Refers to: Cellco Partnership Filed By: Frederick C Phillips APC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Frederick C Phillips APC. Refers to: Cellco Partnership Filed By: Frederick C Phillips APC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillips, Frederick C