This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 07:47:13 (UTC).

Fred L Miller vs. Exterior Specialist

Case Summary

On 03/26/2014 Fred L Miller filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Exterior Specialist. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miller, Fred L

Defendant

Exterior Specialist; DBA : Pacific Coast Home Solutions

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miller, Wade

235 E Broadway

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Miller, Fred L. Refers to: Exterior Specialist

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Miller, Fred L. Refers to: Exterior Specialist

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Efiling General Order

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Efiling Requirements

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Miller, Fred L. Refers to: Exterior Specialist

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Miller, Fred L. Refers to: Exterior Specialist

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Miller, Fred L.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/29/2014 09:15:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 10/10/2014 10:00:00 AM.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 10/10/2014 10:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/29/2014 09:15:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 10/10/2014 at 10:00AM before Judge Timothy Taylor.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Miller, Fred L .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Exterior Specialist.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Miller, Fred L. Filed By: Miller, Fred L (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Miller, Fred L. Refers to: Exterior Specialist Filed By: Miller, Fred L (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Miller, Fred L. Refers to: Exterior Specialist Filed By: Miller, Fred L (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/29/2014 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • Summons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Miller, Fred L. Refers to: Exterior Specialist Filed By: Miller, Fred L (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Miller, Fred L. Refers to: Exterior Specialist Filed By: Miller, Fred L (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC COAST HOME SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER WADE A.