This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/06/2019 at 01:26:38 (UTC).

Frank Sr vs. A & EM Transportation Inc

Case Summary

On 05/03/2019 Frank Sr filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against A EM Transportation Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Sr, Walter

Defendant

A & EM Transportation Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hanning, Nathan A

6755 Bright Ave

Whittier, CA 90601

 

Court Documents

Notice of Conditional Settlement

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Frank, Walter Sr.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Jose H Vargas) filed by Frank, Walter Sr.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Frank, Walter Sr. Refers to: A & EM Transportation Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Frank, Walter Sr. Refers to: A & EM Transportation Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Frank, Walter Sr. Refers to: A & EM Transportation Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/04/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Frank, Walter Sr. Filed By: Frank, Walter Sr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Jose H Vargas) filed by Frank, Walter Sr. Filed By: Frank, Walter Sr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/04/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Frank, Walter Sr. Refers to: A & EM Transportation Inc Filed By: Frank, Walter Sr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Frank, Walter Sr. Refers to: A & EM Transportation Inc Filed By: Frank, Walter Sr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Frank, Walter Sr. Refers to: A & EM Transportation Inc Filed By: Frank, Walter Sr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANNING NATHAN A