This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 11:28:37 (UTC).

FP Compleete Corporation vs Votem Corp

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 FP Compleete Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Votem Corp. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FP Complete Corporation

Defendants

Votem Corp

Votem EC Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Smiley, David W

Attorney at MARKS FINCH THORNTON & BAIRD LLP

Spencer, Daniel R

Attorney at FINCH THORNTON & BAIRD LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Summons

Original Summons filed by FP Complete Corporation. Refers to: Votem Corp; Votem EC Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by FP Complete Corporation. Refers to: Votem Corp; Votem EC Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by FP Complete Corporation. Refers to: Votem Corp; Votem EC Inc

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by FP Complete Corporation. Refers to: Votem Corp

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by FP Complete Corporation. Refers to: Votem EC Inc

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by FP Complete Corporation.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by FP Complete Corporation.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 02/26/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in C-66 before Kenneth J Medel at Central.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/26/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by FP Complete Corporation. Filed By: FP Complete Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by FP Complete Corporation. Filed By: FP Complete Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Votem Corp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Votem EC Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to FP Complete Corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 02/26/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in C-66 before Kenneth J Medel at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by FP Complete Corporation. Refers to: Votem EC Inc Filed By: FP Complete Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by FP Complete Corporation. Refers to: Votem Corp Filed By: FP Complete Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/23/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by FP Complete Corporation. Refers to: Votem Corp; Votem EC Inc Filed By: FP Complete Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by FP Complete Corporation. Refers to: Votem Corp; Votem EC Inc Filed By: FP Complete Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by FP Complete Corporation. Refers to: Votem Corp; Votem EC Inc Filed By: FP Complete Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Votem Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spencer, Daniel R