This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 10:34:48 (UTC).

Ford vs. WESTERN EXTERMINATOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/10/2014 Ford filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WESTERN EXTERMINATOR COMPANY. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOAN M. LEWIS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOAN M. LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ford, Patrick

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Bennion & Deville Fine Homes Socal Inc; DBA : Windermere Real Estate Socal

Jarvey Inc; DBA : San Diego Real Estate & Investments

Kellerhouse, Kathleen A

Kellerhouse, Richard E

Nunn, Mark

Post-Sale Corporation; FKA : WESTERN EXTERMINATOR COMPANY;ESA : WESTERN EXTERMINATOR COMPANY

Spears, Erika

Windermere Real Estate Socal Inc

La Jolla Del Sur Owners Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allemann, Amy Elizabeth

Attorney at QUADE & ASSOCIATES A PLC

3377 Carmel Mountain Road 250

San Diego, CA 92121

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DIDIER, ANDRE C

Attorney at SUNDERLAND MCCUTCHAN LLP

11770 Bernardo Plaza Court Suite 310

San Diego, CA 92128

MCCARRON, ANDREW

1801 Park Ct Pl

Santa Ana, CA 92701

COHEN, JASON A

Attorney at BORTON PETRINI LLP

1320 Columbia Street 210

San Diego, CA 92101

GREEN, IAN M

300 South Grand Avenue 37Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3147

MCCORMICK, JOHN P

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (with prejudice as to Cross-Complaint of Erika Spears) filed by Spears, Erika. Refers to: Windermere Real Estate Socal Inc; Bennion & Deville Fine Homes Socal Inc; Nunn, Mark

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Answer

Answer filed by Kellerhouse, Richard E; Kellerhouse, Kathleen A.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Ford, Patrick.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Ford, Patrick.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by La Jolla Del Sur Owners Association.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Served Notice of Motion & Motion Summary Judgment by Personal Service to Ian M. Green) filed by La Jolla Del Sur Owners Association.

Answer

Answer filed by Post-Sale Corporation.

Request for Entry of Default

The default filed by Ford, Patrick was denied. Refers to: Kellerhouse, Kathleen

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Served Notice of Motion & Motion Summary Judgment by Personal Service to Michael W. Quade) filed by La Jolla Del Sur Owners Association.

Answer

Answer (to Cross-Complaint) filed by Nunn, Mark; Bennion & Deville Fine Homes Socal Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Kellerhouse, Richard E; Kellerhouse, Kathleen A.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Re: Case Management Statement) filed by Nunn, Mark; Bennion & Deville Fine Homes Socal Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Western Exterminator Co.) filed by Ford, Patrick. Refers to: Post-Sale Corporation

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Ford, Patrick.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Ford, Patrick.

Request for Entry of Default

The default filed by Ford, Patrick was denied. Refers to: Kellerhouse, Richard

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (Cross-Complaint re: Conformed Request for Dismissal) filed by Kellerhouse, Richard E.

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Ford, Patrick.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail (Cross-Complaint re: Conformed Request for Dismissal) filed by Kellerhouse, Richard E. Filed By: Kellerhouse, Richard E (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ford, Patrick .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Post-Sale Corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Spears, Erika .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Jarvey Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Kellerhouse, Kathleen A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Kellerhouse, Richard E .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Ford, Patrick. Filed By: Ford, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 10/27/2015 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Western Exterminator Co.) filed by Ford, Patrick. Refers to: Post-Sale Corporation Filed By: Ford, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Kathleen Kellerhouse) filed by Ford, Patrick. Refers to: Kellerhouse, Kathleen Filed By: Ford, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Richard Kellerhouse) filed by Ford, Patrick. Refers to: Kellerhouse, Richard Filed By: Ford, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/26/2014 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Lewis, Joan.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ford, Patrick. Refers to: Post-Sale Corporation; Kellerhouse, Richard; Kellerhouse, Kathleen; Jarvey Inc; Spears, Erika; Bennion & Deville Fine Homes Socal Inc; Windermere Real Estate Socal Inc; Nunn, Mark Filed By: Ford, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Ford, Patrick. Refers to: Post-Sale Corporation; Kellerhouse, Richard; Kellerhouse, Kathleen; Jarvey Inc; Spears, Erika; Bennion & Deville Fine Homes Socal Inc; Windermere Real Estate Socal Inc; Nunn, Mark Filed By: Ford, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Ford, Patrick. Refers to: Post-Sale Corporation; Kellerhouse, Richard; Kellerhouse, Kathleen; Jarvey Inc; Spears, Erika; Bennion & Deville Fine Homes Socal Inc; Windermere Real Estate Socal Inc; Nunn, Mark Filed By: Ford, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less