This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/26/2019 at 03:20:52 (UTC).

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC vs. Nicholas

Case Summary

On 03/05/2012 Ford Motor Credit Company LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nicholas. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

Defendant

Nicholas, James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reese, Harlan M

Attorney at REESE LAW GROUP APLC

3168 Lionshead Ave

Carlsbad, CA 92010

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Statement of Venue

Statement of Venue filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James

Abstract

Abstract of Judgment issued.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • $FILINGDOCUMENT submitted by $PARTNAME rejected on $REJECTIONDATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Ford Motor Credit Company LLC and against Nicholas, James for $ 5556.07, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 900.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 284.50, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 6740.57.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Default entered as to Nicholas, James on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • **Default and/or court Judgment Papers Received**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Venue filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Nicholas, James Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less