This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/26/2019 at 04:34:57 (UTC).

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC vs. Alvarado

Case Summary

On 06/28/2012 Ford Motor Credit Company LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Alvarado. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

Defendants

Alvarado, David Pena

Ramirez, Daisy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reese, Harlan M

Attorney at REESE LAW GROUP APLC

3168 Lionshead Ave

Carlsbad, CA 92010

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Alvarado, David; Ramirez, Daisy

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Alvarado, David; Ramirez, Daisy

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Alvarado, David; Ramirez, Daisy

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Statement of Venue

Statement of Venue filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Alvarado, David

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Ramirez, Daisy

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does (Does 1-10) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC.

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Alvarado, David; Ramirez, Daisy

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Alvarado, David; Ramirez, Daisy

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC rejected on 10/05/2012. Refers to: Alvarado, David; Ramirez, Daisy

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Alvarado, David; Ramirez, Daisy

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Ramirez, Daisy; Alvarado, David

abstract

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC.

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (In Support of Interest) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • *****WRIT RECEIVED*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Ford Motor Credit Company LLC and against Alvarado, David Pena ;Ramirez, Daisy for $ 1998.52, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 375.00, interest: $ 227.37, prejudgment costs: $ 344.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 2944.89.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Ramirez, Daisy; Alvarado, David Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Alvarado, David; Ramirez, Daisy Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2012
  • Court Judgment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Ramirez, Daisy Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Alvarado, David Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Venue filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Alvarado, David; Ramirez, Daisy Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Alvarado, David; Ramirez, Daisy Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. Refers to: Alvarado, David; Ramirez, Daisy Filed By: Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.