This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/20/2022 at 08:12:13 (UTC).

Flores vs Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Flores filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Nationstar Mortgage LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Mangione. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

James A Mangione

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flores, Mario

Defendant

Nationstar Mortgage LLC; DBA : Mr. Cooper

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shapero, Sarah E

100 Pine Center, 100 Pine St Ste 530

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

Baumann, Katalina

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

5 Park Plaza #1400

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Flores, Mario. Refers to: Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Summons

Original Summons filed by Flores, Mario. Refers to: Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Flores, Mario. Refers to: Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief

Complaint filed by Flores, Mario. Refers to: Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Answer filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.; Filed By: Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Flores, Mario. Refers to: Nationstar Mortgage LLC; Filed By: Flores, Mario (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/12/2022 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Mangione, James.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Flores, Mario. Refers to: Nationstar Mortgage LLC; Filed By: Flores, Mario (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Flores, Mario. Refers to: Nationstar Mortgage LLC; Filed By: Flores, Mario (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Flores, Mario. Refers to: Nationstar Mortgage LLC; Filed By: Flores, Mario (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAUMANN KATALINA