This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 07:36:23 (UTC).

Flores vs Johnson

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 Flores filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Flores, Alfonso Urias

Urias, Azucena Ruby

Urias, Esmeralda

Urias, Maria Leticia

Defendants

Johnson, Alani Cenae

Johnson, Chriselle D Hornsby

Johnson, Warren

Johnson, Chriselle D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NATALE, SILVIO

13144 Prairie Ave

Hawthorne, CA 90250

Defendant Attorney

Walshok, Colin H

Attorney at WINGERT GREBING BRUBAKER & JUSKIE LLP

600 W Broadway Unit 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Flores, Alfonso Urias.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Flores, Alfonso Urias.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Flores, Alfonso Urias; Urias, Maria Leticia; Urias, Esmeralda; Urias, Azucena Ruby. Refers to: Johnson, Alani; Johnson, Chriselle D; Johnson, Warren

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Flores, Alfonso Urias; Urias, Maria Leticia; Urias, Esmeralda; Urias, Azucena Ruby. Refers to: Johnson, Alani; Johnson, Chriselle D; Johnson, Warren

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Flores, Alfonso Urias; Urias, Maria Leticia; Urias, Esmeralda; Urias, Azucena Ruby. Refers to: Johnson, Alani; Johnson, Chriselle D; Johnson, Warren

Answer

Answer (WITH POS) filed by Johnson, Alani Cenae; Johnson, Warren; Johnson, Chriselle D.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Flores, Alfonso Urias; Urias, Azucena Ruby; Urias, Esmeralda; Urias, Maria Leticia.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Johnson, Alani Cenae; Johnson, Chriselle D; Johnson, Warren.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Johnson, Alani Cenae; Johnson, Chriselle D; Johnson, Warren.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/08/2022 10:00:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/08/2022 10:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30AM before Judge John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 09:00AM before Judge John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Johnson, Alani Cenae; Johnson, Chriselle D; Johnson, Warren.; Filed By: Johnson, Alani Cenae (Defendant); Johnson, Chriselle D (Defendant); Johnson, Warren (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Johnson, Alani Cenae; Johnson, Chriselle D; Johnson, Warren.; Filed By: Johnson, Alani Cenae (Defendant); Johnson, Chriselle D (Defendant); Johnson, Warren (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Flores, Alfonso Urias; Urias, Azucena Ruby; Urias, Esmeralda; Urias, Maria Leticia.; Filed By: Flores, Alfonso Urias (Plaintiff); Urias, Azucena Ruby (Plaintiff); Urias, Esmeralda (Plaintiff); Urias, Maria Leticia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (WITH POS) filed by Johnson, Alani Cenae; Johnson, Warren; Johnson, Chriselle D.; Filed By: Johnson, Alani Cenae (Defendant); Johnson, Warren (Defendant); Johnson, Chriselle D (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Flores, Alfonso Urias.; Filed By: Flores, Alfonso Urias (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Flores, Alfonso Urias.; Filed By: Flores, Alfonso Urias (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/08/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Flores, Alfonso Urias; Urias, Maria Leticia; Urias, Esmeralda; Urias, Azucena Ruby. Refers to: Johnson, Alani; Johnson, Chriselle D; Johnson, Warren; Filed By: Flores, Alfonso Urias (Plaintiff); Urias, Maria Leticia (Plaintiff); Urias, Esmeralda (Plaintiff); Urias, Azucena Ruby (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Flores, Alfonso Urias; Urias, Maria Leticia; Urias, Esmeralda; Urias, Azucena Ruby. Refers to: Johnson, Alani; Johnson, Chriselle D; Johnson, Warren; Filed By: Flores, Alfonso Urias (Plaintiff); Urias, Maria Leticia (Plaintiff); Urias, Esmeralda (Plaintiff); Urias, Azucena Ruby (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Flores, Alfonso Urias; Urias, Maria Leticia; Urias, Esmeralda; Urias, Azucena Ruby. Refers to: Johnson, Alani; Johnson, Chriselle D; Johnson, Warren; Johnson, Chriselle; Filed By: Flores, Alfonso Urias (Plaintiff); Urias, Maria Leticia (Plaintiff); Urias, Esmeralda (Plaintiff); Urias, Azucena Ruby (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Walshok, Colin H