This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 01:06:12 (UTC).

Flores-Garcia vs MSR Auto Inc

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Flores-Garcia filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MSR Auto Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flores-Garcia, Felipe Ranferi

Defendants

MSR Auto Inc

Surety

Western Surety Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sadr, Kasra

Attorney at THE SADR LAW FIRM APLC

Defendant Attorneys

Quinn, Darren J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DARREN J QUINN

Martinez-Genzon, Rosa

Attorney at ANDERSON MCPHARLIN & CONNERS LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Flores-Garcia, Felipe Ranferi. Refers to: MSR Auto Inc; Surety

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Flores-Garcia, Felipe Ranferi. Refers to: MSR Auto Inc; Surety

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Flores-Garcia, Felipe Ranferi. Refers to: MSR Auto Inc; Surety

Amendment to Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 31) filed by Flores-Garcia, Felipe Ranferi. Refers to: Western Surety Company

Answer to Complaint with Reduced Filing Fee

Answer filed by Western Surety Company.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by MSR Auto Inc.

Answer

Answer filed by MSR Auto Inc.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 12/16/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 12/16/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/16/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by MSR Auto Inc. Filed By: MSR Auto Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by MSR Auto Inc. Filed By: MSR Auto Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Western Surety Company. Filed By: Western Surety Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 31) filed by Flores-Garcia, Felipe Ranferi. Refers to: Western Surety Company Filed By: Flores-Garcia, Felipe Ranferi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Flores-Garcia, Felipe Ranferi. Refers to: MSR Auto Inc; Surety; Western Surety Company Filed By: Flores-Garcia, Felipe Ranferi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Flores-Garcia, Felipe Ranferi. Refers to: MSR Auto Inc; Surety Filed By: Flores-Garcia, Felipe Ranferi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Flores-Garcia, Felipe Ranferi. Refers to: MSR Auto Inc; Surety Filed By: Flores-Garcia, Felipe Ranferi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURETY is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINEZ-GENZON ROSA