This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/18/2021 at 12:19:02 (UTC).

Christopher Flanagan vs Louis Kevin Costa

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 Christopher Flanagan filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Louis Kevin Costa. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Flanagan, Christopher J

Respondents

Costa, Louis Kevin

Prescott, Dan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BARDAVID, JULIO R

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JULIO R BARDAVID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 07/22/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 07/22/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 07/21/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Costa, Louis Kevin. Filed By: Costa, Louis Kevin (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Costa, Louis Kevin. Filed By: Costa, Louis Kevin (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 07/21/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Flanagan, Christopher J. Filed By: Flanagan, Christopher J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/30/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/30/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Flanagan, Christopher J. Filed By: Flanagan, Christopher J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Flanagan, Christopher J. Refers to: Costa, Louis; Prescott, Dan; Flanagan, Reese Filed By: Flanagan, Christopher J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Flanagan, Christopher J. Filed By: Flanagan, Christopher J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/30/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order Correcting Court Record (ROA 2) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARDAVID JULIO R.