This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 08:25:41 (UTC).

Fisher vs. City of Oceanside

Case Summary

On 04/01/2014 Fisher filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Oceanside. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT P DAHLQUIST. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT P DAHLQUIST

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fisher, Karen

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

City of Oceanside

L&R Properties Inc

Pringle Ranch LLC; DBA : Bill's Complete Auto Repair Service

PRINGLE RANCH LLC; DBA : BILL'S COMPLETE AUTO SERVICE;ESA : DBA BILL'S COMPLETE AUTO REPAIR SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Poulsen, Joshua B

Attorney at HARRIS PERSONAL INJURY LAWYERS INC

203 Mission Ave

Oceanside, CA 92054

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MULLEN, JOHN P

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

City Hall - South, 300 N Coast Hwy

Oceanside, CA 92054

NGUYEN, LINH

City Hall - South, 300 N Coast Hwy

Oceanside, CA 92054

SKYER, DAVID C

Attorney at PARKER STRAUS LLP

401 West A Street Suite 1740

San Diego, CA 92101

TYSON, ROBERT F JR

Attorney at TYSON & MENDES LLP

5661 La Jolla Blvd

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by City of Oceanside.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Cross Complaint) filed by L&R Properties Inc.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by City of Oceanside.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Fisher, Karen.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by L&R Properties Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Pringle Ranch LLC.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 01/09/2015 at 09:30:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery (02/20/2015) filed by L&R Properties Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/09/2015 09:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (2/20/15) filed by City of Oceanside.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (2/20/15) filed by City of Oceanside.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement filed by BARKER, DOUGLAS H.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED) filed by Fisher, Karen. Refers to: City of Oceanside; Pringle Ranch LLC; L&R Properties Inc

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED) filed by L&R Properties Inc. Refers to: City of Oceanside

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED) filed by City of Oceanside. Refers to: L&R Properties Inc

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by City of Oceanside.

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2015
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to L&R Properties Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to City of Oceanside.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Fisher, Karen .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to L&R Properties Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Pringle Ranch LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to City of Oceanside.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to City of Oceanside.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to L&R Properties Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by City of Oceanside. Filed By: City of Oceanside (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED) filed by City of Oceanside. Refers to: L&R Properties Inc Filed By: City of Oceanside (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Pringle Ranch LLC. Refers to: L&R Properties Inc Filed By: Pringle Ranch LLC (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Pringle Ranch LLC. Refers to: Fisher, Karen Filed By: Pringle Ranch LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by City of Oceanside.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/19/2014 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fisher, Karen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Fisher, Karen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Fisher, Karen.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.