This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/26/2019 at 06:05:38 (UTC).

First Investors Servicing Corporation vs. Jackson

Case Summary

On 06/21/2012 First Investors Servicing Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jackson. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First Investors Servicing Corporation

Defendant

Jackson, Monique L; AKA : Jackson, Monique

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Prober, Dean R

Attorney at PROBER & RAPHAEL A LAW CORPORATION

20750 Ventura Blvd #100

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Statement of Venue

Statement of Venue filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation.

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court submitted by First Investors Servicing Corporation rejected on 08/23/2012. Refers to: Jackson, Monique

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation.

WRIT

Writ of Execution issued.

ABSTRACT

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Correspondence

Correspondence (Retrun to Court-Writ of Execution) filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Correspondence (Retrun to Court-Writ of Execution) filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Filed By: First Investors Servicing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Filed By: First Investors Servicing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for First Investors Servicing Corporation and against Jackson, Monique L for $ 20034.81, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 1800.00, interest: $ 2339.10, prejudgment costs: $ 432.20, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 24606.11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique Filed By: First Investors Servicing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique Filed By: First Investors Servicing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Entry of Judgment filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique Filed By: First Investors Servicing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • **COURT default/judgment rec'd**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court submitted by First Investors Servicing Corporation rejected on 08/23/2012. Refers to: Jackson, Monique Filed By: First Investors Servicing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Filed By: First Investors Servicing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • **COURT DEFAULT/JUDGMENT REC'D**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique Filed By: First Investors Servicing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Venue filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Filed By: First Investors Servicing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique Filed By: First Investors Servicing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique Filed By: First Investors Servicing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by First Investors Servicing Corporation. Refers to: Jackson, Monique Filed By: First Investors Servicing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.