This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 11:38:35 (UTC).

First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company vs Progressive Pharmacy Solutions Inc

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 First-Citizens Bank Trust Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Progressive Pharmacy Solutions Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company

Defendants

Progressive Pharmacy Solutions Inc

Alexander, Vanessa

Mansor, Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Iezza, Nick I

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Alan L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ALAN L WILLIAMS

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by Alexander, Vanessa.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Refers to: Alexander, Vanessa

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Refers to: Progressive Pharmacy Solutions Inc

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Refers to: Progressive Pharmacy Solutions Inc; Alexander, Vanessa; Mansor, Thomas

Original Summons

[A document for ROA# 3]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Refers to: Alexander, Vanessa Filed By: First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Refers to: Progressive Pharmacy Solutions Inc Filed By: First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Alexander, Vanessa. Filed By: Alexander, Vanessa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Refers to: Progressive Pharmacy Solutions Inc; Alexander, Vanessa; Mansor, Thomas Filed By: First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Refers to: Progressive Pharmacy Solutions Inc; Alexander, Vanessa; Mansor, Thomas Filed By: First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Refers to: Progressive Pharmacy Solutions Inc; Alexander, Vanessa; Mansor, Thomas Filed By: First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Citizens Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IEZZA NICK I.