This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/09/2018 at 10:50:02 (UTC).

Fireside Bank vs. Alfredo Gutierrez

Case Summary

On 11/09/2009 Fireside Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Alfredo Gutierrez. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRESIDE BANK

Defendant

GUTIERREZ, ALFREDO ; AKA : GUTIERREZ, ALFREDO JR

Assignee

CAVALRY INVESTMENTS LCC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRENOVOST, THOMAS J JR

Assignee Attorney

GORDON, JOHN E

Attorney at WINN LAW GROUP APC

110 East Wilshire Avenue 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

Case File Contents as of 07/18/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 07/18/17 - volume 1 of 1

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/09/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Gutierrez, Alfredo on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Fireside Bank .

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/09/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD

OSC - Other scheduled for 04/08/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 04/08/2010 08:30:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Gutierrez, Alfredo, on 01/22/2010, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 07/18/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Cavalry Investments LCC. Filed By: Cavalry Investments LCC (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Cavalry Investments LCC. Filed By: Cavalry Investments LCC (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Cavalry Investments LCC. Refers to: Gutierrez, Alfredo Filed By: Cavalry Investments LCC (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • ****Writ of Execution for San Diego county issued for judgment creditor Cavalry Investments LLC and against judgment debtor Alfredo Gutierrez****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Cavalry Investments LCC. Refers to: Gutierrez, Alfredo Filed By: Cavalry Investments LCC (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • *****Writ Received*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Fireside Bank. Filed By: Fireside Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • Notice - Other (notice of assignment of judgment) filed by Fireside Bank. Refers to: Cavalry Investments LCC Filed By: Fireside Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/09/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • Answer filed by Gutierrez, Alfredo. Refers to: Fireside Bank Filed By: Gutierrez, Alfredo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Gutierrez, Alfredo. Refers to: Gutierrez, Alfredo Filed By: Gutierrez, Alfredo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Fireside Bank. Refers to: Gutierrez, Alfredo Filed By: Fireside Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2009
  • Original Summons filed by Fireside Bank. Refers to: Gutierrez, Alfredo Filed By: Fireside Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2009
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2009
  • Original Summons filed by Fireside Bank. Refers to: Gutierrez, Alfredo Filed By: Fireside Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fireside Bank. Refers to: Gutierrez, Alfredo Filed By: Fireside Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2009
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Fireside Bank. Refers to: Gutierrez, Alfredo Filed By: Fireside Bank (Plaintiff); Cavalry Investments LCC (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2009
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.