This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:32:36 (UTC).

FINLAN vs. DARCY MD

Case Summary

On 02/14/2014 FINLAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DARCY MD. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE BACAL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE BACAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

FINLAN, JENNIFER

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AZER MD, PHILIP

COOPER MD, LAWRANCE NATHAN

DARCY MD, SEAN

GARBUTT MD, MARK

HERZOG MD, RUDOLPH ERICH

LUDWIG MD, JON KEITH

LUM CRNA, FRANCIS

MARTIN MD, FREDERIC RENE

SCHAFER MD, JEFFRY

SOUTH BAY HEAD AND NECK MEDICAL GROUP INC; DBA : New Image Cosmetic Surgery

Scripps Health; DBA : Scripps Mercy Hospital

Sharp Coronado Hospital and Healthcare Center

Coronado Hospital Foundation

HERZOG MD, RUDOLF ERICH

CORONADO MEDICAL BUILDING PARTNERSHIP

LUDWIG MD, JON KEITH; AKA : LUDWIG MD, JON K

SCHAFER MD, JEFREY

LOCUMTENENS.COM LLC

LOCUMENES.COM LLC

Defendants and Respondents

Sharp Coronado Hospital and Healthcare Center

Coronado Hospital Foundation

HERZOG MD, RUDOLF ERICH

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Cross, Daniel J

Attorney at CROSS LAW CORPORATION

925 B Street 305

San Diego, CA 92101

SCHREIBER, BRETT J

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CRAMER, N BEN

Attorney at LA FOLLETTE JOHNSON DE HAAS FESLER & AMES

501 W Broadway #1075

San Diego, CA 92101

Hudson, Clark R

Attorney at NEIL DYMOTT FRANK MCFALL & TREXLER

1010 2Nd Avenue #2500

San Diego, CA 92101

CARROLL, RICHARD DOUGLAS

Attorney at CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN MCBRIDE & P

111 W Ocean Boulevard 14Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

ZERMENO, JR., ROBERT A

HOLM, MARGARET M

Attorney at SEDGWICK LLP

2020 Main Street #1100

Irvine, CA 92614

GREEN, PAUL A

835 Wilshire Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90017

LOW, WILLIAM M

Attorney at HIGGS FLETCHER & MACK

401 W A Street 2600

San Diego, CA 92101

Doggett, Jeffrey S

Attorney at LOTZ DOGGETT & RAWERS LLP

101 W Broadway 1110

San Diego, CA 92101

BELSKY, DANIEL S

Attorney at DAVIS GRASS GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY

591 Camino De La Reina Suite 640

San Diego, CA 92108

OBERRECHT, KIMBERLY S

Attorney at HORTON OBERRECHT KIRKPATRICK & MARTHA

225 Broadway # 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

STOOPACK, OLIVIA J

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Doggett, Jeffrey S

Attorney at LOTZ DOGGETT & RAWERS LLP

101 W Broadway 1110

San Diego, CA 92101

BELSKY, DANIEL S

Attorney at DAVIS GRASS GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY

591 Camino De La Reina Suite 640

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication

Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication (AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS) filed by HERZOG MD, RUDOLPH ERICH.

Request - Other

Request - Other (For Statement of Damages) filed by HERZOG MD, RUDOLPH ERICH.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by GARBUTT MD, MARK.

Record on Appeal Civil Case Index Form -Chronological SD

Record on Appeal Civil Case Index Form -Chronological SD generated.

Reply to Separate Statement

Reply filed by Schafer MD, Jeffry; South Bay Head and Neck Medical Group Inc.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by FINLAN, JENNIFER. Refers to: Darcy MD, Sean; New Image Cosmetic Surgery; South Bay Head and Neck Medical Group Inc; Garbutt MD, Mark; Sharp Coronado Hospital and Healthcare Center; Scripps Health; Scripps Mercy Hospital; Azer MD, Philip; COOPER MD, LAWRANCE; Herzog MD, Rudolf; Ludwig MD, Jon; Martin MD, Frederic; Schafer MD, Jeffry; Lum CRNA, Francis

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Scripps Health.

Notice of Filing SD

Notice of Appeal filed by FINLAN, JENNIFER. Refers to: Herzog MD, Rudolf; Sharp Coronado Hospital and Healthcare Center; Coronado Hospital Foundation

Declaration of Paul A. Green, Esq., ISO Defendant's Jeffrey Schafer, M.D.'s and South Bay Head and Neck Medical Group, Inc.'s ISO Joint MSJ

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Paul A. Green, Esq., ISO Defendant's Jeffrey Schafer, M.D.'s and South Bay Head and Neck Medical Group, Inc.'s ISO Joint MSJ) filed by Schafer MD, Jeffry; South Bay Head and Neck Medical Group Inc.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by DARCY MD, SEAN.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/26/2016 11:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 01/27/2017 11:00:00 AM.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by Schafer MD, Jeffry; South Bay Head and Neck Medical Group Inc received but not filed on 11/07/2016.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (to continue hearing on defendant Motion for Summary Judgment -LATE-) filed by FINLAN, JENNIFER.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Not Entered) filed by Finlan, Jennifer.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Schafer MD, Jeffry; South Bay Head and Neck Medical Group Inc; South Bay Head and Neck Medical Group Inc. Refers to: Locumtenens.com LLC; Coronado Medical Building Partnership

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery (FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS) filed by LUM CRNA, FRANCIS.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/04/2015 01:30:00 PM.

297 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Finlan, Jennifer, on 02/19/2014, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Finlan, Jennifer, on 02/19/2014, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Finlan, Jennifer, on 12/21/2015, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (as to complaint and cross-complaint) filed by Finlan, Jennifer. Filed By: Finlan, Jennifer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Not Entered) filed by Finlan, Jennifer. Filed By: Finlan, Jennifer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Not Entered) filed by Finlan, Jennifer. Filed By: Finlan, Jennifer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 04/05/2017 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 04/05/2017 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
468 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Litigants SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/10/2014 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by FINLAN, JENNIFER. Filed By: Finlan, Jennifer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by FINLAN, JENNIFER. Refers to: Darcy MD, Sean; New Image Cosmetic Surgery; South Bay Head and Neck Medical Group Inc; Garbutt MD, Mark; Sharp Coronado Hospital and Healthcare Center; Scripps Health; Scripps Mercy Hospital; Azer MD, Philip; COOPER MD, LAWRANCE; Herzog MD, Rudolf; Ludwig MD, Jon; Martin MD, Frederic; Schafer MD, Jeffry; Lum CRNA, Francis Filed By: Finlan, Jennifer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by FINLAN, JENNIFER. Refers to: Darcy MD, Sean; New Image Cosmetic Surgery; South Bay Head and Neck Medical Group Inc; Garbutt MD, Mark; Sharp Coronado Hospital and Healthcare Center; Scripps Health; Scripps Mercy Hospital; Azer MD, Philip; COOPER MD, LAWRANCE; Herzog MD, Rudolf; Ludwig MD, Jon; Martin MD, Frederic; Schafer MD, Jeffry; Lum CRNA, Francis Filed By: Finlan, Jennifer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by FINLAN, JENNIFER. Refers to: Darcy MD, Sean; South Bay Head and Neck Medical Group Inc; Garbutt MD, Mark; Sharp Coronado Hospital and Healthcare Center; Scripps Health; Azer MD, Philip; COOPER MD, LAWRANCE; Herzog MD, Rudolf; Ludwig MD, Jon; Martin MD, Frederic; Schafer MD, Jeffry; Lum CRNA, Francis Filed By: Finlan, Jennifer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.