This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 05:36:29 (UTC).

Figueroa vs Ensign Services Inc

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 Figueroa filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Ensign Services Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Figueroa, Debra

Defendants

Anza Healthcare Inc; DBA : Victoria Post Acute Care

Ensign Services Inc

Mora, Arvie

Port, Barry

ANZA HEALTHCARE INC

ENSIGN CLOVERDALE LLC

ENSIGN ENTERPRISES INC

ENSIGN MONTGOMERY LLC

ENSIGN PALM I LLC

ENSIGN PANORAMA LLC

ENSIGN PLEASANTON LLC

ENSIGN SAN DIMAS LLC

ENSIGN SANTA ROSA LLC

ENSIGN SONOMA LLC

ENSIGN SOUTHLAND LLC

ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC

ENSIGN WHITTIER WEST LLC

ENSIGN WILLITS LLC

THE ENSIGN GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jafari, David

Attorney at JAFARI LAW GROUP INC

18201 Von Karman Avenue 1190

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant Attorney

Trotter, Julie R

610 Newport Center Drive 700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Figueroa, Debra.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Figueroa, Debra. Refers to: ENSIGN ENTERPRISES INC

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Figueroa, Debra. Refers to: THE ENSIGN GROUP INC

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Figueroa, Debra. Refers to: ENSIGN WHITTIER WEST LLC

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Figueroa, Debra. Refers to: ENSIGN WILLITS LLC

Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

Answer filed by ANZA HEALTHCARE INC; MORA, ARVIE; PORT, BARRY; ENSIGN SERVICES INC.

POS_AnzaHealthcare.pdf

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra.

POS_EnsignCloverdale.pdf

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra.

POS_EnsignGroup.pdf

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra.

POS_EnsignPalm.pdf

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra.

POS_EnsignPanorama.pdf

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra.

POS_EnsignPleasanton.pdf

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra.

POS_EnsignSanDimas.pdf

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra.

POS_EnsignSantaRosa.pdf

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra.

POS_EnsignServices.pdf

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra.

POS_EnsignSonoma.pdf

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra.

POS_EnsignSouthland.pdf

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra.

POS_EnsignWhittierEast.pdf

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra.

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Figueroa, Debra. Refers to: ENSIGN MONTGOMERY LLC Filed By: Figueroa, Debra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra. Filed By: Figueroa, Debra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra. Filed By: Figueroa, Debra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra. Filed By: Figueroa, Debra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra. Filed By: Figueroa, Debra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra. Filed By: Figueroa, Debra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra. Filed By: Figueroa, Debra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra. Filed By: Figueroa, Debra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Figueroa, Debra. Filed By: Figueroa, Debra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Figueroa, Debra. Refers to: Anza Healthcare Inc Filed By: Figueroa, Debra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Figueroa, Debra. Refers to: Port, Barry Filed By: Figueroa, Debra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Figueroa, Debra. Refers to: Mora, Arvie Filed By: Figueroa, Debra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/14/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Figueroa, Debra. Refers to: Ensign Services Inc; Anza Healthcare Inc; Mora, Arvie; Port, Barry Filed By: Figueroa, Debra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Figueroa, Debra. Refers to: Ensign Services Inc; Anza Healthcare Inc; Mora, Arvie; Port, Barry Filed By: Figueroa, Debra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Figueroa, Debra. Refers to: Ensign Services Inc; Anza Healthcare Inc; Mora, Arvie; Port, Barry Filed By: Figueroa, Debra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENSIGN PALM 1 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ENSIGN PANORAMA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ENSIGN WHITTIER EAST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Anza Healthcare Inc; DBA : VICTORIA POST ACUTE CARE is a litigant