This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/20/2021 at 08:21:25 (UTC).

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE vs OLIVAS

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OLIVAS. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

Olivas, Patricia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rousso, Mary Ann

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Olivas, Patricia

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Olivas, Patricia

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Olivas, Patricia

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Olivas, Patricia

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Olivas, Patricia Filed By: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/11/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Olivas, Patricia Filed By: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Olivas, Patricia Filed By: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: Olivas, Patricia Filed By: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Freeland, Cynthia.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY A NEBRASKA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROUSSO MARY A.