This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 16:31:06 (UTC).

Fidare Management Inc vs Afshar MD

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 Fidare Management Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Afshar MD. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIDARE MANAGEMENT INC

Defendants

AFSHAR MD, POUYA

INTEGRATED HEALTHCARE ALLIANCE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FANNING, CHARLES L.

Attorney at THE FANNING LAW FIRM APC

501 W Broadway Suite 800

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Fidare Management Inc.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Fidare Management Inc. Refers to: Afshar MD, Pouya; Integrated Healthcare Alliance Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Fidare Management Inc. Refers to: Afshar MD, Pouya; Integrated Healthcare Alliance Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fidare Management Inc. Refers to: Afshar MD, Pouya; Integrated Healthcare Alliance Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/15/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Fidare Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Integrated Healthcare Alliance Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Afshar MD, Pouya .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Fidare Management Inc. Filed By: Fidare Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/15/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fidare Management Inc. Refers to: Afshar MD, Pouya; Integrated Healthcare Alliance Inc Filed By: Fidare Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Fidare Management Inc. Refers to: Afshar MD, Pouya; Integrated Healthcare Alliance Inc Filed By: Fidare Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Fidare Management Inc. Refers to: Afshar MD, Pouya; Integrated Healthcare Alliance Inc Filed By: Fidare Management Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fanning, Charles L.