This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/08/2018 at 08:34:44 (UTC).

Fia Card Services, N.A. vs. Manuel Tiznado

Case Summary

On 08/07/2009 Fia Card Services, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Manuel Tiznado. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-SC

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIA CARD SERVICES NA

Defendant

TIZNADO, MANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENRIQUES, JANALIE

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES

151 Bernal Road 8

San Jose, CA 95119-1306

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 06/01/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default heard 06/01/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 09/13/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default heard 09/13/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Judgment scheduled for 04/05/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Judgment heard 04/05/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Dismissal SD

Notice of Dismissal SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2011
  • Default Judgment by Clerk rejected.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • Location changed from Shelf to Clerks judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Judgment heard 04/05/2011 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Failure to File Judgment scheduled for 04/05/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • Clerk judgment submitted rejected

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • Default entered as to Tiznado, Manuel on Complaint filed by FIA Card Services NA .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by FIA Card Services NA. Refers to: Tiznado, Manuel Filed By: FIA Card Services NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 09/13/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default heard 06/01/2010 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 06/01/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • Certificate of Service filed by Fia Card Services, N.A.. Filed By: FIA Card Services NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Fia Card Services, N.A.. Refers to: Tiznado, Manuel Filed By: FIA Card Services NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • Original Summons filed by Fia Card Services, N.A.. Refers to: Tiznado, Manuel Filed By: FIA Card Services NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fia Card Services, N.A.. Refers to: Tiznado, Manuel Filed By: FIA Card Services NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • Complaint filed by Fia Card Services, N.A.. Refers to: Tiznado, Manuel Filed By: FIA Card Services NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.