This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 09:11:16 (UTC).

F&FC INVESTMENT CORP VS YOLANDA BORQUEZ PESQUERIRA LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 F FC INVESTMENT CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YOLANDA BORQUEZ PESQUERIRA LIVING TRUST. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

F&FC Investment Corp

Defendants

161 01 00

591 161 07 00

APN 570 340 31 00

La Mesa Partners Inc; DBA : Keller Williams Realty

Pesquerira Descendants Trust dated

Philipson, Gregg Michael

YOLANDA BORQUEZ PESQUERIRA LIVING TRUST

all persons unknown claiming any interest in the property commonly known as 3680 Mesa Vista Way Bonita CA 91902 1132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Griffin, Andrew H III

275 E Douglas Avenue 112

El Cajon, CA 92020

Defendant Attorney

Abergel, Shane

Attorney at MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER LLP

801 S Figueroa St 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3012

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by F&FC Investment Corp. Refers to: YOLANDA BORQUEZ PESQUERIRA LIVING TRUST; Pesquerira Descendants Trust dated 04 28 15; La Mesa Partners Inc; Philipson, Gregg

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by F&FC Investment Corp. Refers to: YOLANDA BORQUEZ PESQUERIRA LIVING TRUST; Pesquerira Descendants Trust dated 04 28 15; La Mesa Partners Inc; Philipson, Gregg

Complaint

Complaint filed by F&FC Investment Corp. Refers to: YOLANDA BORQUEZ PESQUERIRA LIVING TRUST; Pesquerira Descendants Trust dated 04 28 15; La Mesa Partners Inc; Philipson, Gregg; all persons unknown claiming any interest in the property commonly known as 3680 Mesa Vista Way Bonita CA 91902 1132; APN 570 340 31 00; 591 161 07 00; 161 01 00

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (of Shane Abergel Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 430.41) filed by La Mesa Partners Inc; Philipson, Gregg Michael.

Request for Judicial Notice (Requests)

Request for Judicial Notice filed by Philipson, Gregg Michael; La Mesa Partners Inc.

Motion to Strike (Motions)

Motion to Strike filed by Philipson, Gregg Michael; La Mesa Partners Inc.

Demurrer (Motions)

Demurrer filed by Philipson, Gregg Michael; La Mesa Partners Inc.

Notice of Errata

Notice of Errata filed by F&FC Investment Corp.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike - Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike - Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer filed by Philipson, Gregg Michael; La Mesa Partners Inc. Filed By: Philipson, Gregg Michael (Defendant); La Mesa Partners Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike filed by Philipson, Gregg Michael; La Mesa Partners Inc. Filed By: Philipson, Gregg Michael (Defendant); La Mesa Partners Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice filed by Philipson, Gregg Michael; La Mesa Partners Inc. Filed By: Philipson, Gregg Michael (Defendant); La Mesa Partners Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Errata filed by F&FC Investment Corp. Filed By: F&FC Investment Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Shane Abergel Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 430.41) filed by La Mesa Partners Inc; Philipson, Gregg Michael. Filed By: La Mesa Partners Inc (Defendant); Philipson, Gregg Michael (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/10/2021 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by F&FC Investment Corp. Refers to: YOLANDA BORQUEZ PESQUERIRA LIVING TRUST; Pesquerira Descendants Trust dated 04 28 15; La Mesa Partners Inc; Philipson, Gregg; all persons unknown claiming any interest in the property commonly known as 3680 Mesa Vista Way Bonita CA 91902 1132; APN 570 340 31 00; 591 161 07 00; 161 01 00 Filed By: F&FC Investment Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by F&FC Investment Corp. Refers to: YOLANDA BORQUEZ PESQUERIRA LIVING TRUST; Pesquerira Descendants Trust dated 04 28 15; La Mesa Partners Inc; Philipson, Gregg Filed By: F&FC Investment Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by F&FC Investment Corp. Refers to: YOLANDA BORQUEZ PESQUERIRA LIVING TRUST; Pesquerira Descendants Trust dated 04 28 15; La Mesa Partners Inc; Philipson, Gregg Filed By: F&FC Investment Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Keller Williams Realty, Inc. is a litigant