This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/16/2022 at 07:11:11 (UTC).

Farmers Insurance Exchange vs Arberry

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 Farmers Insurance Exchange filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Arberry. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Farmers Insurance Exchange

Defendants

Arberry, James Desean

U-Haul Co of Arizona

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rose, David

Attorney at STRATMAN SCHWARTZ & WILLIAMS ABREGO

P O Box 248916

Oklahoma City, OK 73124

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange. Refers to: Arberry, James; U-Haul Co of Arizona

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange. Refers to: Arberry, James; U-Haul Co of Arizona

Complaint

Complaint filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange. Refers to: Arberry, James; U-Haul Co of Arizona

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange. Filed By: Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/29/2022 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange. Refers to: Arberry, James; U-Haul Co of Arizona Filed By: Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange. Refers to: Arberry, James; U-Haul Co of Arizona Filed By: Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange. Refers to: Arberry, James; U-Haul Co of Arizona Filed By: Farmers Insurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant