This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/27/2021 at 06:16:35 (UTC).

Fairfield Development LP vs California Window Concepts Incorporated

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 Fairfield Development LP filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against California Window Concepts Incorporated. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fairfield Development LP

Defendant

California Window Concepts Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEIN, DAVID A

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Fairfield Development LP.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Abstract of Judgment submitted by Fairfield Development LP rejected on 09/16/2020. Refers to: California Window Concepts Incorporated

Confession of Judgment

Confession of Judgment filed by Fairfield Development LP. Refers to: California Window Concepts Incorporated

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fairfield Development LP. Refers to: California Window Concepts Incorporated

Attorney Declaration in Support of Confession of Judgment Statement

Declaration - Other filed by Fairfield Development LP. Refers to: California Window Concepts Incorporated

Declaration of J. Scott Alexander

Declaration - Other filed by Fairfield Development LP. Refers to: California Window Concepts Incorporated

[Proposed] Judgment by Confession

Judgment filed by Fairfield Development LP. Refers to: California Window Concepts Incorporated

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered on 08/18/2020 was amended as follows: Judgment entered for Fairfield Development LP and against California Window Concepts Incorporated for $ 270000.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 15800.61, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court $ .00, for a grand total of $ 285800.61

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment submitted by Fairfield Development LP rejected on 09/16/2020. Refers to: California Window Concepts Incorporated Filed By: Fairfield Development LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by Fairfield Development LP. Filed By: Fairfield Development LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Fairfield Development LP and against California Window Concepts Incorporated for $ 270000.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 17132.07, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 287132.07.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConfession of Judgment filed by Fairfield Development LP. Refers to: California Window Concepts Incorporated Filed By: Fairfield Development LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fairfield Development LP. Refers to: California Window Concepts Incorporated Filed By: Fairfield Development LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Fairfield Development LP. Refers to: California Window Concepts Incorporated Filed By: Fairfield Development LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Fairfield Development LP. Refers to: California Window Concepts Incorporated Filed By: Fairfield Development LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment filed by Fairfield Development LP. Refers to: California Window Concepts Incorporated Filed By: Fairfield Development LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fairfield Development LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEIN, DAVID A.