This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 05:24:14 (UTC).

Evans vs Nijiya Market

Case Summary

On 01/11/2017 Evans filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Nijiya Market. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVANS, PATRICK

Defendants

JINON CORPORATION

HORNG JOW CORPORATION

NIJIYA MARKET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIN, TED S

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF TED S SHIN

888 Prospect St

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Evans, Patrick. Refers to: HORNG JOW CORPORATION

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Evans, Patrick. Refers to: HORNG JOW CORPORATION

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Evans, Patrick. Refers to: Nijiya Market

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Evans, Patrick.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Evans, Patrick. Refers to: Nijiya Market

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Evans, Patrick. Refers to: Nijiya Market; Jinon Corporation; HORNG JOW CORPORATION

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Evans, Patrick. Refers to: Nijiya Market; Jinon Corporation; HORNG JOW CORPORATION

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Evans, Patrick. Refers to: Nijiya Market; Jinon Corporation; HORNG JOW CORPORATION

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Evans, Patrick.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Evans, Patrick, on 01/12/2017, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Evans, Patrick, on 01/12/2017, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/16/2017 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Evans, Patrick. Filed By: Evans, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Nijiya Market.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Jinon Corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Evans, Patrick .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Evans, Patrick. Refers to: Nijiya Market Filed By: Evans, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Evans, Patrick. Refers to: Nijiya Market Filed By: Evans, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Evans, Patrick. Refers to: HORNG JOW CORPORATION Filed By: Evans, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to HORNG JOW CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/16/2017 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Evans, Patrick. Filed By: Evans, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Evans, Patrick. Refers to: Nijiya Market; Jinon Corporation; HORNG JOW CORPORATION Filed By: Evans, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Evans, Patrick. Refers to: Nijiya Market; Jinon Corporation; HORNG JOW CORPORATION Filed By: Evans, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Evans, Patrick. Refers to: Nijiya Market; Jinon Corporation; HORNG JOW CORPORATION Filed By: Evans, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Evans, Patrick. Filed By: Evans, Patrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JINON CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ENTITY DBA NIJIYA MARKET is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIN, TED S