Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/18/2020 at 10:02:42 (UTC).

Evans vs. Ilich

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Evans filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Ilich. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Evans, Casey

Respondents

Doe, John

Doe, Kim

Ilich, Kimberly ; ESA : Doe, Kim

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 01/03/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order reassigned to for 01/03/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in N-03 at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned from N-02 to N-03 effective 12/22/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketRestraining order as requested denied with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 12/20/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCASEY EVANS request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 12/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department N-02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 12/13/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 01/03/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-02 .

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Ilich, Kimberly. Filed By: Ilich, Kimberly (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence (Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service) filed by Evans, Casey. Refers to: Ilich, Kimberly Filed By: Evans, Casey (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Evans, Casey. Refers to: Ilich, Kimberly Filed By: Evans, Casey (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Evans, Casey. Refers to: Doe, John; Ilich, Kimberly Filed By: Evans, Casey (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Evans, Casey. Refers to: Doe, John; Ilich, Kimberly Filed By: Evans, Casey (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Evans, Casey. Refers to: Ilich, Kimberly Filed By: Evans, Casey (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Evans, Casey. Refers to: Ilich, Kimberly Filed By: Evans, Casey (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-02 .

    Read MoreRead Less