Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/14/2020 at 08:35:18 (UTC).

Euston Development LLC VS Castillo

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Euston Development LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Castillo. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Euston Development LLC

Defendant

Castillo, Melissa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McKinley, James R

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Euston Development LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Euston Development LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Euston Development LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Euston Development LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Euston Development LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Euston Development LLC received but not filed on 01/28/2020. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Melissa Castillo) filed by Euston Development LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Euston Development LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment (with supporting documents) filed by Euston Development LLC. Filed By: Euston Development LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Euston Development LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa Filed By: Euston Development LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Euston Development LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa Filed By: Euston Development LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for Euston Development LLC and against Castillo, Melissa for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Euston Development LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa Filed By: Euston Development LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Euston Development LLC received but not filed on 01/28/2020. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa Filed By: Euston Development LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Melissa Castillo) filed by Euston Development LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa Filed By: Euston Development LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Castillo, Melissa on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Euston Development LLC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Euston Development LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa Filed By: Euston Development LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Euston Development LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa Filed By: Euston Development LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Euston Development LLC. Refers to: Castillo, Melissa Filed By: Euston Development LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less