This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/18/2021 at 07:16:06 (UTC).

Eulitt vs JPMCB-Card Service

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 Eulitt filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JPMCB-Card Service. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eulitt, Sandy

Defendant

JPMCB-Card Service

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Eulitt, Sandy. Refers to: JPMCB-Card Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Eulitt, Sandy.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Request for Reset of Small Claims Trial - Initial

Request for Reset of Small Claims Trial - Initial filed by Eulitt, Sandy.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-63; Event Type: Small Claims Court Trial - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketThe Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 03/01/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in C-63 before at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 03/01/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Reset of Small Claims Trial - Initial filed by Eulitt, Sandy. Filed By: Eulitt, Sandy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 01/21/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Eulitt, Sandy. Refers to: JPMCB-Card Service Filed By: Eulitt, Sandy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Eulitt, Sandy. Filed By: Eulitt, Sandy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Eulitt, Sandy. Filed By: Eulitt, Sandy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMCB-Card Service is a litigant