Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/16/2021 at 12:21:21 (UTC).

Ethan Mitchem vs Miranda Mitchem

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 Ethan Mitchem filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Miranda Mitchem. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mitchem, Ethan

Respondent

Mitchem, Miranda

Guardian Ad Litem

Mitchem, Aglika

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/26/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Mitchem, Miranda. Filed By: Mitchem, Miranda (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Mitchem, Ethan. Refers to: Mitchem, Miranda Filed By: Mitchem, Ethan (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Mitchem, Ethan. Refers to: Mitchem, Aglika; Mitchem, Miranda Filed By: Mitchem, Ethan (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Mitchem, Ethan. Refers to: Mitchem, Aglika; Mitchem, Miranda Filed By: Mitchem, Ethan (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mitchem, Ethan. Refers to: Mitchem, Aglika; Mitchem, Miranda Filed By: Mitchem, Ethan (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Mitchem, Aglika. Refers to: Mitchem, Ethan Filed By: Mitchem, Aglika (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Mitchem, Ethan. Filed By: Mitchem, Ethan (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Mitchem, Ethan. Filed By: Mitchem, Ethan (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 02/26/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less