This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/29/2018 at 16:33:31 (UTC).

Estate of William Mark Bandt

Case Summary

On 08/14/2015 Estate of William Mark Bandt was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA C. KELETY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA C. KELETY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator

BANDT, GWENDOLYN

Decedent

BANDT, WILLIAM MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator Attorney

RAU, HENRY T.

Attorney at RAU LAW FIRM

13500 Sw 72Nd Ave

Portland, OR 97223

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Refers to: Bandt, William

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Refers to: Bandt, William

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 09/24/2015 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

Amendment

Amendment (Amendments to Petition for Probate Filed August 14, 2015) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

Returned Mail

Returned Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

Inventory and Appraisal - Final

Inventory and Appraisal - Final ($250,000.00) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

Report of Status and Petition to Extend Letters

Status Report (and Petition to Extend Letters) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Status Report scheduled for 06/06/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Report heard 06/06/2017 09:00:00 AM.

Status Report

Status Report (Report of Status of Administration; Petition for Extension of Administration) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Report heard 08/01/2017 09:00:00 AM.

Letters Extended/Reissued

Letters Extended/Reissued (Letters expire: 06/30/2018) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters Extended/Reissued (Letters expire: 06/30/2018) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Status Report heard 08/01/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Status Report set for 09/12/2017 at 09:00AM vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Status Report scheduled for 09/12/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Status Report (Report of Status of Administration; Petition for Extension of Administration) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Status Report heard 06/06/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Status Report continued pursuant to party's motion to 08/01/2017 at 09:00AM before Judge Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Status Report scheduled for 06/06/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Status Report (and Petition to Extend Letters) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action (William Mark Bandt II) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action (Christopher H. Bandt) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action (Victoria Rau) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Order for Probate (& Letters) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 09/24/2015 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Refers to: Bandt, William Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Refers to: Bandt, William Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAU HENRY THEODORE