This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/01/2020 at 01:59:12 (UTC).

Estate of William Lawrence Hamling, Jr.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Estate of William Lawrence Hamling, Jr was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia C. Kelety. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Julia C. Kelety

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator

Hamling-Ball, Debbie J

Decedent

Hamling Jr, William Lawrence

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator Attorney

Meeker, Keith L

 

Court Documents

Amended Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J.

Second Amended Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Petition for Probate was rescheduled to 07/09/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 07/09/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Petition for Probate was rescheduled to 05/14/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J.

Affidavit of Good Faith

Affidavit of Good Faith filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Order for Probate (and Letters for Probate) submitted by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J rejected on 03/09/2020.

Amendment Number One to Petition

Amendment (Amendment Number One to Petition for Letters of Administration; Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administrations of Estates Act) filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J.

Petition for Letters of Administration filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J. - 02/13/2020

Petition for Letters of Administration filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J. Refers to: Hamling, William; Hamling-Ball, Debbie

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J. - 02/13/2020

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J. Refers to: Hamling, William

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 04/02/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingLocation: 503; Event Type: Petition for Probate - Petition for Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J. Filed By: Hamling-Ball, Debbie J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J. Filed By: Hamling-Ball, Debbie J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Petition for Probate was rescheduled to 07/09/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate scheduled for 07/09/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Petition for Probate was rescheduled to 05/14/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J. Filed By: Hamling-Ball, Debbie J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Probate (and Letters for Probate) submitted by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J rejected on 03/09/2020. Filed By: Hamling-Ball, Debbie J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Good Faith filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J. Filed By: Hamling-Ball, Debbie J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J. Filed By: Hamling-Ball, Debbie J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment (Amendment Number One to Petition for Letters of Administration; Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administrations of Estates Act) filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J. Filed By: Hamling-Ball, Debbie J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate scheduled for 04/02/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J. Refers to: Hamling, William; Hamling-Ball, Debbie Filed By: Hamling-Ball, Debbie J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Hamling-Ball, Debbie J. Refers to: Hamling, William Filed By: Hamling-Ball, Debbie J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.