This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2020 at 03:48:58 (UTC).

Estate of Virginia A Frassler vs Leffingwell

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Estate of Virginia A Frassler filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Leffingwell. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dorris, Randal C

Estate of Virginia A Fassler

Defendants

LEFFINGWELL, DELIA

CCW La Jolla LLC

Home Care Assistance Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smith, John Scott

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by LEFFINGWELL, DELIA. Refers to: Estate of Virginia A Fassler

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in whole) filed by LEFFINGWELL, DELIA.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Estate of Virginia A Fassler; Dorris, Randal C. Refers to: LEFFINGWELL, DELIA; Home Care Assistance Inc; CCW La Jolla LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Estate of Virginia A Fassler; Dorris, Randal C. Refers to: LEFFINGWELL, DELIA; Home Care Assistance Inc; CCW La Jolla LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Estate of Virginia A Fassler; Dorris, Randal C. Refers to: LEFFINGWELL, DELIA; Home Care Assistance Inc; CCW La Jolla LLC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by LEFFINGWELL, DELIA. Refers to: Estate of Virginia A Fassler Filed By: LEFFINGWELL, DELIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by LEFFINGWELL, DELIA. Filed By: LEFFINGWELL, DELIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in whole) filed by LEFFINGWELL, DELIA. Filed By: LEFFINGWELL, DELIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/17/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Estate of Virginia A Fassler; Dorris, Randal C. Refers to: LEFFINGWELL, DELIA; Home Care Assistance Inc; CCW La Jolla LLC Filed By: Estate of Virginia A Fassler (Plaintiff); Dorris, Randal C (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Estate of Virginia A Fassler; Dorris, Randal C. Refers to: LEFFINGWELL, DELIA; Home Care Assistance Inc; CCW La Jolla LLC Filed By: Estate of Virginia A Fassler (Plaintiff); Dorris, Randal C (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Estate of Virginia A Fassler; Dorris, Randal C. Refers to: LEFFINGWELL, DELIA; Home Care Assistance Inc; CCW La Jolla LLC Filed By: Estate of Virginia A Fassler (Plaintiff); Dorris, Randal C (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.