Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/18/2019 at 06:54:24 (UTC).

Estate of Ventur A. Pena

Case Summary

On 10/26/2017 Estate of Ventur A Pena was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT LONGSTRETH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT LONGSTRETH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator

PENA, JUSTIN M.

Decedent

PENA, VENTUR A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator Attorney

BECKSTRAND, DWIGHT

895 Aerovista Place 102

San Luis Obispo, CA 93401

 

Court Documents

Letters of Administration

Letters of Administration (LETTERS EXPIRE: 09/28/2019) filed by Pena, Justin M..

Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD

Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD generated.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Pena, Justin M..

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 02/01/2018 01:30:00 PM.

Response to Probate Notes

Response to Probate Notes filed by Pena, Justin M..

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 02/15/2018 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Pena, Justin M..

Response to Probate Notes

Response to Probate Notes filed by Pena, Justin M..

Affidavit of Publication

Affidavit of Good Faith filed by Pena, Justin M..

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 03/28/2018 01:30:00 PM.

Proposed Order for Probate

Order for Probate filed by Pena, Justin M..

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 12/14/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Administration to Creditors

Notice of Administration to Creditors filed by Pena, Justin M..

Petition for Letters of Administration

Petition for Letters of Administration filed by Pena, Justin M.. Refers to: Pena, Ventur; Pena, Justin

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by Pena, Justin M..

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 12/14/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-3 Robert Longstreth.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters of Administration (LETTERS EXPIRE: 09/28/2019) filed by Pena, Justin M.. Filed By: Pena, Justin M. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate filed by Pena, Justin M.. Filed By: Pena, Justin M. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 03/28/2018 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Court updated role of Justin M. Pena to Administrator.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • The Petition for Letters of Administration filed by Justin M. Pena is granted. Court appointed Justin M. Pena as Administrator for the Estate of Ventur A. Pena on 03/28/2018. Letters to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Good Faith filed by Pena, Justin M.. Filed By: Pena, Justin M. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Probate Notes filed by Pena, Justin M.. Filed By: Pena, Justin M. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Pena, Justin M.. Filed By: Pena, Justin M. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 02/15/2018 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2018
  • Petition for Probate continued pursuant to party's motion to 02/15/2018 at 01:30PM before Judge Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Pena, Justin M.. Filed By: Pena, Justin M. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Administration to Creditors filed by Pena, Justin M.. Filed By: Pena, Justin M. (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 12/14/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Petition for Probate continued pursuant to party's motion to 02/01/2018 at 01:30PM before Judge Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 12/14/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-3 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Longstreth, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by Pena, Justin M.. Filed By: Pena, Justin M. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration filed by Pena, Justin M.. Refers to: Pena, Ventur; Pena, Justin Filed By: Pena, Justin M. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dwight G Beckstrand