This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/25/2018 at 02:33:55 (UTC).

Estate of Tomas De Leon

Case Summary

On 09/08/2017 Estate of Tomas De Leon was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA C. KELETY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA C. KELETY

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SILVA, DEBRA

ADVANCE INHERITANCE, LLC

Decedent

DE LEON, TOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

GOODRICH, JOHN Q

Attorney at GOODRICH & CHEUNG LLP

8555 Aero Drive Ste 210

San Diego, CA 92123

LEESTMA, JAMES LAMBERT

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JAMES LAMBERT LEESTMA

7301 Topanga Canyon Boulevard 202

Canoga Park, CA 91303

 

Court Documents

Petition - Other

Petition - Other (Petition for Order to Remove Administrator; Require Adminstrator to Sell Estate Real Property; Require Executor to File Inventory and Appraisal) filed by Advance Inheritance, LLC.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Estates) scheduled for 10/09/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Citation - Probate

Citation - Probate filed by Advance Inheritance, LLC.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Advance Inheritance, LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Notice of Hearing, Citation Probate, Petition for Order to Remove Administrator, etc....) filed by Advance Inheritance, LLC.

Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD

Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD generated.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Second Assignment of Beneficial Interest in Decedent's Estate; Declaration of Compliance; Proof of Service) filed by Advance Inheritance, LLC.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by De Leon, Tomas. Refers to: Silva, Debra

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by De Leon, Tomas. Refers to: Silva, Debra

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 11/02/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by Silva, Debra.

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by Silva, Debra.

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by Silva, Debra.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Silva, Debra.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Silva, Debra.

Order for Probate

Order for Probate filed by Silva, Debra.

Letters of Administration

Letters of Administration (LETTERS EXPIRE; 06/14/2019) filed by Silva, Debra.

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (Notice of Hearing, Citation Probate, Petition for Order to Remove Administrator, etc....) filed by Advance Inheritance, LLC. Filed By: Advance Inheritance, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Advance Inheritance, LLC. Filed By: Advance Inheritance, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Citation - Probate filed by Advance Inheritance, LLC. Filed By: Advance Inheritance, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Other (Estates) scheduled for 10/09/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - Other (Petition for Order to Remove Administrator; Require Adminstrator to Sell Estate Real Property; Require Executor to File Inventory and Appraisal) filed by Advance Inheritance, LLC. Filed By: Advance Inheritance, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Second Assignment of Beneficial Interest in Decedent's Estate; Declaration of Compliance; Proof of Service) filed by Advance Inheritance, LLC. Filed By: Advance Inheritance, LLC (Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters of Administration (LETTERS EXPIRE; 06/14/2019) filed by Silva, Debra. Filed By: Silva, Debra (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate filed by Silva, Debra. Filed By: Silva, Debra (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 12/14/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Silva, Debra. Filed By: Silva, Debra (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Silva, Debra. Filed By: Silva, Debra (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by Silva, Debra. Filed By: Silva, Debra (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by Silva, Debra. Filed By: Silva, Debra (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by Silva, Debra. Filed By: Silva, Debra (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 11/02/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by De Leon, Tomas. Refers to: Silva, Debra Filed By: De Leon, Tomas (Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by De Leon, Tomas. Refers to: Silva, Debra Filed By: De Leon, Tomas (Decedent)

    Read MoreRead Less